EP0848938 - Improved female fastening portion for an absorbent article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.01.2002 [2002/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Busam, Ludwig Talstrasse 17 65510 Hünstetten / DE | 02 /
Celliers, Jeremy Michael Kettenhofweg 107 60325 Frankfurt/Main / DE | 03 /
Müller, Jörg Alte Haingasse 15 61184 Karben / DE | [1998/26] | Representative(s) | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/26] | Canonici, Jean-Jacques, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 96120454.2 | 19.12.1996 | [1998/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0848938 | Date: | 24.06.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/62, A44B18/00 | [1998/26] | CPC: |
D04B21/02 (EP);
A61F13/15 (KR);
A44B18/0034 (EP);
A44B18/0073 (EP);
A61F13/622 (EP);
A61F13/627 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [1998/26] | Title | German: | Weibliches Verschlusselement für einen absorbierenden Artikel | [2001/45] | English: | Improved female fastening portion for an absorbent article | [1998/26] | French: | Partie femelle d'attache pour article absorbant | [1998/26] |
Former [1998/26] | Weissliches Verschlusselement für einen absorbierenden Artikel | Examination procedure | 22.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/09] | 13.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 10.11.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2002/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US5554239 (DATTA PAUL J [US], et al) [YD] 1,2,4-9 * column 8, line 20 - line 37 * * column 10, line 29 - line 56; figures 3,4,8 *; | [Y]EP0278866 (KAYSERSBERG SA [FR]) [Y] 1,2,4-9 * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 25 * * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 10; figures 2-4 *; | [A]EP0319249 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,5-9 * page 5, line 16 - line 34 * * page 8, line 25 - page 9, line 36; figures 1-4 *; | [E]US5614281 (JACKSON WANDA W [US], et al) [E] 1 * column 5, line 43 - column 6, line 9; figure 2; claims 1,11,16,17 *; | [A]EP0694642 (MILLIKEN RES CORP [US]) [A] 1,3,4 * the whole document *; | [A]US5326612 (GOULAIT DAVID J K [US]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 38 - line 66 *; | [A]GB1438721 (KANEBO LTD) [A] 1 * page 1, line 75 - line 86 * * page 2, line 46 - line 85 * | by applicant | USRE26151E | US3848594 | US4985025 | EP0286030 | US4259957 | EP0235014 | US5554239 | US3860003 | US4834735 | US4699622 | US4315508 |