EP0783082 - Sealing ring and use thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 15.06.2001 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2005 | Change: Appeal number | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Parker Hannifin GmbH, Geschäftsbereich ERMETO Am Metallwerk 9 33659 Bielefeld / DE | [1997/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Müller, Kurt Am Metallwerk ) 33659 Bielefeld / DE | [1997/28] | Representative(s) | Wolff, Michael Patentanwalt Kirchheimer Strasse 69 Sillenbuch 70619 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/28] | Wolff, Michael, Dipl.-Phys. Patentanwalt, Kirchheimer Strasse 1, Sillenbuch 70619 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 96120826.1 | 23.12.1996 | [1997/28] | Priority number, date | DE1996100141 | 04.01.1996 Original published format: DE 19600141 | [1997/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0783082 | Date: | 09.07.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/32, B29C33/00 | [1997/28] | CPC: |
B29C45/0025 (EP);
F16J15/3236 (EP);
B29C2045/0027 (EP);
B29C2045/0036 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1997/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Dichtungsring und Verwendung desselben | [1997/28] | English: | Sealing ring and use thereof | [1997/28] | French: | Bague d'étanchéité et son utilisation | [1997/28] | Examination procedure | 05.06.1997 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/32] | 28.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.09.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2001/31] | 10.06.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/31] | Appeal following examination | 04.11.2000 | Appeal received No. T0160/01 | 14.05.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant inadmissible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3653670 (SIFRI ELIE C, et al) [Y] 1,2 * column A * * column 2, line 50 - line 59 * * column 3, line 20 - line 25; figure - *; | [YA]DE4223709 (PARKER PRAEDIFA GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1,2 * abstract * [A] 3-5 | by applicant | US3768819 |