EP0782233 - An electrical connection box for an automotive vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 28.03.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie 510 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1997/27] | For all designated states SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi City Mie 510 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sumida, Tatsuya, Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510 / JP | 02 /
Maeda, Yoshihiro, Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-City, Mie, 510 / JP | [1997/27] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/27] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 96120833.7 | 23.12.1996 | [1997/27] | Priority number, date | JP19950343029 | 28.12.1995 Original published format: JP 34302995 | JP19950343036 | 28.12.1995 Original published format: JP 34303695 | JP19950343037 | 28.12.1995 Original published format: JP 34303795 | [1997/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0782233 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0782233 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/00, B60R16/02, H02G3/08 | [1997/27] | CPC: |
B60R16/0238 (EP,US);
H02G3/08 (EP,US);
H01H2085/208 (EP,US);
H01H2085/2085 (EP,US);
H01R9/245 (EP,US);
H01R9/2466 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1997/27] | Title | German: | Ein elektrisches Verbindungsgehäuse für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [1997/27] | English: | An electrical connection box for an automotive vehicle | [1997/27] | French: | Un boîtier de connexion électrique pour un véhicule automobile | [1997/27] | Examination procedure | 16.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/27] | 27.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01) | 16.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01112479.9 / EP1130731 | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9429145 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES AUTOMOTIVE [US]) [X] 1,2,7 * page 10, line 7 - page 10, line 19 * * page 14, line 14 - page 14, line 25; figures 1,2 * [A] 3; | [A]EP0665570 (WHITAKER CORP [US]) [A] 1-4 * column 9, line 28 - column 9, line 39; figure 1 *; | [A]US5023752 (DETTER GARY C [US], et al) [A] 1,2 * column 9, line 8 - column 9, line 24; figure 2 * | by applicant | JPH02136989U | JP19950091698 | JP19950091699 |