EP0790381 - Door closer with controlled closing movement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.02.2000 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E C O SCHULTE GMBH & CO. KG Iserlohner Landstrasse 117 58706 Menden / DE | [1997/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulte, Ernst August Macke Strasse 14 58706 Menden / DE | [1997/34] | Representative(s) | Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wissgott Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | COHAUSZ DAWIDOWICZ HANNIG & SOZIEN Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1997/34] | COHAUSZ HASE DAWIDOWICZ & PARTNER Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 96120855.0 | 23.12.1996 | [1997/34] | Priority number, date | DE1995148202 | 22.12.1995 Original published format: DE 19548202 | [1997/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0790381 | Date: | 20.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0790381 | Date: | 07.10.1998 | [1998/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1998 | Classification | IPC: | E05F3/16, E05F5/12, E05F5/10 | [1998/41] | CPC: |
E05F5/12 (EP);
E05F3/16 (EP);
E05F2003/228 (EP);
E05F3/221 (EP);
E05F5/06 (EP);
E05Y2201/21 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1997/34] | E05F3/16 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/34] | Title | German: | Türschliesser mit kontrolliertem Schliessablauf | [1997/34] | English: | Door closer with controlled closing movement | [1997/34] | French: | Ferme porte à mouvement de fermeture contrôlé | [1997/34] | Examination procedure | 01.07.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/13] | 14.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/13] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 07.09.1999 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid | 31.12.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]DE19545401 (GEZE GMBH & CO [DE]) [E] 1-8,10-13,20,27 * column 4 - column 5, line 65; figure - *; | [XY]US2108891 (JOHNSON ELVIN H) [X] 1,3-10,12,13,16,20 * page 1; figure - * [Y] 21-24; | [Y]EP0444378 (KLEIN IBERICA [ES]) [Y] 21 * column 5, line 10 - line 29; figure - *; | [Y]DE3729597 (LIEDGENS KARL [DE]) [Y] 22-24 * column 2, line 39 - line 46; figure - *; | [XAY]DE4012358 (SCHULTE) [X] 1-9,12,13,27-31 * column 2, line 52 - column 4; figure - * [A] 11,25,26,33 [Y] 33; | [Y]DE29503583U (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 33 * page 5, line 14 - line 15; figure - *; | [A]DE377169 (FRITZ G MUKDEN) [A] 3 * claim 1 *; | [A]DE3301808 (ALNA KOKI CO [JP], et al) [A] 22,23,34 * abstract * | by applicant | US633682 | DE2428605 |