EP0784159 - Hydraulic actuator, particularly for tipping an industrial vehicle cab [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.12.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.01.2000 [2000/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FLENCO S.p.A. Corso Torino, 2 10051 Avigliana / IT | [1997/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Caratti, Piercarlo Via A. Balzico, 6 10100 Torino / IT | [1997/30] | Representative(s) | Franzolin, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/29] | Franzolin, Luigi, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 96121007.7 | 30.12.1996 | [1997/29] | Priority number, date | IT1996TO00005 | 09.01.1996 Original published format: IT TO960005 | [1997/29] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0784159 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F15B15/14, B62D33/06, F16F9/346 | [1997/29] | CPC: |
B62D33/067 (EP);
F15B15/1428 (EP);
F15B15/149 (EP);
F16F9/346 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, NL, SE [1997/29] | Title | German: | Hydraulischer Aktuator, besonders für das Kippen der Fahrerkabine eines Nutzfahrzeuges | [1997/29] | English: | Hydraulic actuator, particularly for tipping an industrial vehicle cab | [1997/29] | French: | Actionneur hydraulique, notamment pour basculer la cabine d'un véhicule utilitaire | [1997/29] | Examination procedure | 13.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/12] | 01.07.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/03] | 04.08.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2000/03] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS57177409 ; | [A]FR1077677 (MARCEL PASQUET) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X]DE928447 (TOUSSAINT & HESS GMBH) [X] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [X]DE8117274U (OPEL ADAM AG) [X] 1-3 * page 7, paragraph 3 - page 8, paragraph 2; figure - *; | [DA]EP0101129 (APPLIED POWER INC [US]) [DA] 1-4,7 * page 3, lines 14-29; figure - *; | [A]DE4102002 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 5,6* the whole document *; | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830129), vol. 007, no. 024, Database accession no. (M - 189), & JP57177409 A 19821101 (HINO JIDOSHA KOGYO KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract * | [A] - "MONROE SENSA-TRAC, UN NOUVEAU CONCEPT", REVUE TECHNIQUE AUTOMOBILE, (19941101), vol. 49, no. 567, page 35 (1), XP000472648 [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0101129 |