EP0742446 - A method and apparatus for determining the relative positioning of bodies [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.07.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.07.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.08.2000 [2000/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FINMECCANICA S.p.A. AZIENDA ANSALDO Piazza Carignano, 2 16128 Genova / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/46] | For all designated states FINMECCANICA S.p.A. AZIENDA ANSALDO Piazza Carignano, 2 I-16128 Genova / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parenti, Riccardo Via Sapeto, 22/38 I-16132 Genova / IT | [1996/46] | Representative(s) | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/46] | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96200012.1 | 04.01.1996 | [1996/46] | Priority number, date | IT1995MI00924 | 09.05.1995 Original published format: IT MI950924 | [1996/46] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0742446 | Date: | 13.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/46] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G01S3/786 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
G01S3/789 (EP);
G01S3/786 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/46] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Anordnung zur Messung der relativen Lage von Körpern zueinander | [1996/46] | English: | A method and apparatus for determining the relative positioning of bodies | [1996/46] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour la détection de la position relative entre des corps | [1996/46] | Examination procedure | 18.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 29.10.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/35] | 07.04.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3038079 (MUELLER ROLF K) [Y] 1-3 * column 2, line 14 - line 60; figure 1 *; | [A]DE2309006 (KOSMEIER HEINRICH C) [A] * page 5, line 13 - page 7, line 3; figure 1 *; | [A]US4043672 (BAUMGARTNER VIKTOR) [A] * abstract *; | [A]US4796198 (BOULTINGHOUSE KARLAN D [US], et al) [A] * column 6, line 41 - line 61; figure 5 *; | [A]US4855915 (DALLAIRE RODNEY J [US]) [A] * column 3, line 32 - line 53; figure 1 *; | [Y]EP0468677 (SPECTRA PHYSICS LASERPLANE INC [US]) [Y] 1-3 * page 14, line 40 - page 15, line 17; figure 2 * |