EP0715321 - Solenoid valve control circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1999 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokura-kita-ku Kita-kyusyu-shi Fukuoka / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/23] | For all designated states TOTO LTD. 1-1, Nakashima 2-chome, Kokura-kita-ku Kita-kyusyu-shi, Fukuoka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yoshida, Takao, c/o Toto Ltd. Chigasaki Fact., 8-1 Honson 2-chome Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 02 /
Ikeda, Toshio, c/o Toto Ltd. Chigasaki Fact., 8-1 Honson 2-chome Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 03 /
Douke, Takahiro, c/o Toto Ltd. Chigasaki Fact., 8-1 Honson 2-chome Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | 04 /
Eki, Toshio, c/o Toto Ltd. Chigasaki Fact., 8-1 Honson 2-chome Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa / JP | [1996/23] | Representative(s) | Price, Anthony Stuart Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | Price, Anthony Stuart Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street London EC4V 4EL / GB | ||
Former [1996/23] | Price, Anthony Stuart Frank B. Dehn & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96200372.9 | 21.11.1988 | [1996/23] | Priority number, date | JP19870294800 | 20.11.1987 Original published format: JP 29480087 | JP19870294801 | 20.11.1987 Original published format: JP 29480187 | [1996/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0715321 | Date: | 05.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0715321 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | [1996/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0715321 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H01F7/18 | [1996/23] | CPC: |
H01F7/1844 (EP,US);
H01F7/18 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1996/23] | Title | German: | Steuerschaltung für ein Magnetventil | [1996/23] | English: | Solenoid valve control circuit | [1996/23] | French: | Circuit de contrôle pour une électrovanne | [1996/23] | Examination procedure | 23.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/10] | 24.02.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.10.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.10.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.10.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 02.10.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP88310980.3 / EP0317365 | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/03] | Request for further processing for: | 20.10.1997 | Request for further processing filed | 20.10.1997 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 21.11.1997 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 26.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.02.1999 | BE | 03.02.1999 | CH | 03.02.1999 | ES | 03.02.1999 | GR | 03.02.1999 | IT | 03.02.1999 | LI | 03.02.1999 | NL | 03.02.1999 | SE | 03.02.1999 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/09] | AT | 03.02.1999 | |
BE | 03.02.1999 | ||
CH | 03.02.1999 | ||
ES | 03.02.1999 | ||
GR | 03.02.1999 | ||
LI | 03.02.1999 | ||
NL | 03.02.1999 | ||
SE | 03.02.1999 | ||
Former [2002/26] | AT | 03.02.1999 | |
BE | 03.02.1999 | ||
CH | 03.02.1999 | ||
ES | 03.02.1999 | ||
GR | 03.02.1999 | ||
LI | 03.02.1999 | ||
SE | 03.02.1999 | ||
Former [2002/23] | AT | 03.02.1999 | |
BE | 03.02.1999 | ||
CH | 03.02.1999 | ||
GR | 03.02.1999 | ||
LI | 03.02.1999 | ||
SE | 03.02.1999 | ||
Former [2001/23] | AT | 03.02.1999 | |
BE | 03.02.1999 | ||
CH | 03.02.1999 | ||
GR | 03.02.1999 | ||
LI | 03.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/52] | AT | 03.02.1999 | |
BE | 03.02.1999 | ||
CH | 03.02.1999 | ||
LI | 03.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/50] | AT | 03.02.1999 | |
BE | 03.02.1999 | ||
CH | 10.05.1999 | ||
LI | 10.05.1999 | ||
Former [2000/23] | AT | 03.02.1999 | |
BE | 03.02.1999 | ||
Former [2000/21] | AT | 03.02.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPS556369 ; | [A]JPS56118882 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19800325), vol. 004, no. 035, Database accession no. (P - 003), & JP55006369 A 19800117 (MINOLTA CAMERA CO LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19811223), vol. 005, no. 203, Database accession no. (M - 103), & JP56118882 A 19810918 (TOKYO ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] * abstract * |