EP0728698 - Process for removing SO2 from gases which contain it, with direct production of elemental sulfur [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENGITEC S.r.l. Viale Jenner 51 20159 Milano / IT | [1999/48] |
Former [1996/35] | For all designated states ENGITEC S.p.A. Viale Jenner, 51 20159 Milano / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olper, Marco Via Crescitelli, 6 I-20052 Monza (Milano) / IT | 02 /
Maccagni, Massimo Via Saint Denis, 65 I-20099 Sesto San Giovanni (Milano) / IT | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Appoloni, Romano, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.P.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria, 9 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | Appoloni, Romano, et al ING. BARZANO' & ZANARDO MILANO S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96200411.5 | 17.02.1996 | [1996/35] | Priority number, date | IT1995MI00357 | 24.02.1995 Original published format: IT MI950357 | [1996/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0728698 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0728698 | Date: | 28.07.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C01B17/44, C01B17/05, B01D53/50 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
B01D53/501 (EP,US);
B01D53/502 (EP,US);
C01B17/05 (EP,US);
C01B17/44 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, NL [1996/35] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entfernung von Schwefeldioxid aus Gasen, die dieses enthalten, unter gleichzeitigen Herstellung von Elementarschwefel | [1996/35] | English: | Process for removing SO2 from gases which contain it, with direct production of elemental sulfur | [1996/35] | French: | Procédé d'élimination d'anhydre sulfureux des gazes le contenant, avec production directe de soufre élémentaire | [1996/35] | Examination procedure | 03.12.1996 | Examination requested [1997/05] | 10.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.09.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.07.1999 | FR | 28.07.1999 | NL | 28.07.1999 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/09] | BE | 28.07.1999 | |
NL | 28.07.1999 | ||
FR | 24.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/25] | BE | 28.07.1999 | |
FR | 24.12.1999 | ||
Former [2000/24] | BE | 28.07.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4078048 (NADKARNI RAVINDRA M) [A] 1-8 * column W *; | [A]DE3523073 (OUTOKUMPU OY [FI]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0205976 (METALNA STROJEGRADNJA KONSTRUK [YU]) |