EP0728407 - A sowing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2000 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.11.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.01.2001 [2001/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MAASLAND N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | [1996/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bom, Cornelis J.G. 16 Laan van Nieuw Rozenburg 3181 VC Rozenburg / NL | 02 /
Brabander, Adrianus P.M. 19 de Driesprong 2295 LL Kwintsheul / NL | 03 /
Tollenaar, Eduard 381 Purmerhoek 2295 VR Capelle a/d Ijssel / NL | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Cornelis van der Lelylaan 1 3147 PB Maassluis / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1998/48] | Corten, Maurice Jean F.M., et al Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | ||
Former [1996/35] | Mulder, Herman Octrooibureau Van der Lely N.V. Weverskade 10 3155 PD Maasland / NL | Application number, filing date | 96200420.6 | 19.02.1996 | [1996/35] | Priority number, date | NL19950000335 | 22.02.1995 Original published format: NL 9500335 | [1996/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0728407 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0728407 | Date: | 19.01.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A01C7/20 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
A01C7/201 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/35] | Title | German: | Sähmaschine | [1996/35] | English: | A sowing machine | [1996/35] | French: | Semoir | [1996/35] | Examination procedure | 03.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/14] | 23.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.05.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.10.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE2949266 (AMAZONEN-WERKE) [XD] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]FR1455700 (AMAZONEN-WERKE) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8700392 (MASSEY-FERGUSON) [A] 5,6 * page 3, paragraph 6 - page 5, paragraph 3; figures 1-3 *; | [A]GB2042314 (AMAZONEN-WERKE) [A] 1,5,10 * page 2, line 97 - page 4, line 121; figures 1-5 * |