EP0719036 - Electronic still picture camera [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.05.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.06.2006 [2006/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Taguchi, Tomishige, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha Tamagawa-Jigyosho, 770, Shimonoge, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Kondo, Makoto, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha Tamagawa-Jigyosho, 770, Shimonoge, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Mimura, Toshihiko, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha Tamagawa-Jigyosho, 770, Shimonoge, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | 04 /
Ohara, Eiji, c/o Canon Kabushiki Kaisha Tamagawa-Jigyosho, 770, Shimonoge, Takatsu-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1996/26] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/26] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96200546.8 | 05.11.1990 | [1996/26] | Priority number, date | JP19890288561 | 06.11.1989 Original published format: JP 28856189 | JP19890288563 | 06.11.1989 Original published format: JP 28856389 | JP19900284385 | 24.10.1990 Original published format: JP 28438590 | [1996/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0719036 | Date: | 26.06.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0719036 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | [1996/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0719036 | Date: | 13.07.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/64, H04N1/21, H04N9/04 | [1996/51] | CPC: |
H04N1/2129 (EP,US);
H04N1/2112 (EP,US);
H04N1/2137 (EP,US);
H04N1/646 (EP,US);
H04N23/84 (EP,US);
H04N25/134 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1996/26] | H04N1/64 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/26] | Title | German: | Elektronische Standbildkamera | [1996/26] | English: | Electronic still picture camera | [1996/26] | French: | Caméra électronique d'image fixe | [1996/26] | Examination procedure | 07.05.1997 | Examination requested [1997/28] | 07.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.09.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.06.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.06.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 15.11.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 15.11.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90312108.5 / EP0428310 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/25] | Request for further processing for: | 15.11.2004 | Request for further processing filed | 15.11.2004 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.11.2004 | Decision despatched | 12.06.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 12.06.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.06.2002 | Decision despatched | 25.09.2000 | Request for further processing filed | 25.09.2000 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.10.2000 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.11.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.11.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.11.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 26.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 18.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5686592 ; | [A]JPH01122293 ; | [XY]EP0202009 (POLAROID CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,23 * column A; figure 1 * * page 7, line 14 - page 9, line 21 * * page 10, line 1 - line 9 * * page 13, line 1 - page 14, line 4 * [Y] 4-13,16-22; | [X]US4651227 (YUNOKI YUTAKA [JP], et al) [X] 27-33 * column A; figures 1-20 *; | [XA]JPS6262676 (CANON KK) [X] 23-26,34,35 * the whole document * [A] 1-22,27-33; | [A]US4758883 (KAWAHARA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 4-13,16-22 * column A; figures 1-10 * * column 2, line 32 - line 64 * * column 4, lines 1-37 * * column 6, line 24 - column 7, line 62 *; | [A]EP0289944 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4-10,12,16-33 * column A; figures 1-11 * * column 6, line 42 - line 51 *; | [A]US4800448 (KANEKO KIYOTAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1,5,14,16,23,27,34 * column A; figures 1-5 * * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 45 * * column 7, line 11 - line 18 * * column 7, line 65 - column 8, line 44 *; | [A]US4827347 (BELL CYNTHIA S [US]) [A] 1-3,13,23-26,34 * column A; figures 1,4 * * column 5, line 11 - line 29 *; | [A]EP0323194 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 1,5,14,16,23,27,34 * column A; figures 1-13 * * column 6, line 57 - column 8, line 39 *; | [X]EP0336317 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]) [X] 14,15 * column A; figures 1-10 * * column 3, line 5 - column 5, line 9 * * column 7, line 17 - line 49 *; | US4901160 [ ] (KINOSHITA TAKAO [JP], et al) [ ] * column A; figures 1-7 * * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 45 *; | [Y] - T. MURAKAMI, "A DSP architecture for 64kps Motion video coding", IEEE SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, (198806), vol. 1, pages 227 - 230, XP000252725 [Y] 4-13,16-22 * the whole document * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 153, Database accession no. (E - 076), & JP56086592 A 00000000 (OKI ELECTRIC) [A] 13 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 13, no. 366, Database accession no. (E - 806), & JP01122293 A 00000000 (HITACHI) [A] 23,24,34 * abstract * |