EP0730023 - Laundry concentrates [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York NY 10022-7499 / US | ||
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10022-7499 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Motyka, Andrea L. 4979 Edgewood Road Doylestown, Pennsylvania / US | 02 /
Kugler, Alison 22 Water Street South River, New Jersey / US | 03 /
Broze, Guy 34, Rue Claskin 4460 Grace-Hollogne / BE | [1996/36] | Representative(s) | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., et al Vereenigde Postbus 87930 2508 DH Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | Smulders, Theodorus A.H.J., Ir., et al Vereenigde Octrooibureaux Nieuwe Parklaan 97 2587 BN 's-Gravenhage / NL | Application number, filing date | 96200550.0 | 01.03.1996 | [1996/36] | Priority number, date | US19950396858 | 01.03.1995 Original published format: US 396858 | [1996/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0730023 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0730023 | Date: | 11.08.1999 | [1999/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0730023 | Date: | 28.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C11D1/72, C11D3/20, C11D17/00, C11D1/835 | [1999/32] | CPC: |
C11D3/2013 (EP,US);
C11D1/835 (EP,US);
C11D17/0017 (EP,US);
C11D17/003 (EP,US);
C11D3/0015 (EP,US);
C11D3/201 (EP,US);
C11D1/62 (EP,US);
C11D1/72 (EP,US);
C11D1/74 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1996/36] | C11D1/72, C11D3/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/36] | Title | German: | Waschmittelkonzentrate | [1996/36] | English: | Laundry concentrates | [1996/36] | French: | Concentrés de détergents | [1996/36] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/14] | 07.07.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 20.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE HENKEL KGaA VTP (Patente) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/16] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.02.2004
ADMISSIBLE Henkel KGaA VTP (Patente) 40191 Düsseldorf / DE | 07.04.2004 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 06.05.2004 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.2003 | BE | 28.05.2003 | CH | 28.05.2003 | FI | 28.05.2003 | FR | 28.05.2003 | IT | 28.05.2003 | LI | 28.05.2003 | NL | 28.05.2003 | DK | 28.08.2003 | GR | 28.08.2003 | PT | 28.08.2003 | SE | 28.08.2003 | DE | 29.08.2003 | ES | 08.09.2003 | [2008/06] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
BE | 28.05.2003 | ||
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
FR | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
BE | 28.05.2003 | ||
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/23] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
DK | 28.08.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
DE | 29.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
FI | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 28.05.2003 | |
CH | 28.05.2003 | ||
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
ES | 08.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/02] | CH | 28.05.2003 | |
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
NL | 28.05.2003 | ||
GR | 28.08.2003 | ||
PT | 28.08.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2004/01] | CH | 28.05.2003 | |
LI | 28.05.2003 | ||
SE | 28.08.2003 | ||
Former [2003/50] | SE | 28.08.2003 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1066407 (UNILEVER LTD) [A] 1-24* example -; claim - *; | [DX]GB2007734 (CARGO FLEET CHEMICAL CO) [DX] 1,8,9 * page 1, line 26 - line 28 * * example -; claim - *; | [X]EP0013780 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-11,16-19 * page 3, line 30 - line 33 * * page 6, line 23 - line 25 * * page 7, line 19 - line 24 * * page 8, line 13 - line 17 * * page 9, line 16 - line 26 *; | [X]EP0082456 (HOECHST AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,7-9,16-19 * abstract * * page 4, line 5 * * page 6; example 3 * * page 7, line 14 - line 23 *; | [A]GB2207446 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *; | [D]EP0503221 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]); | [X]WO9215745 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,3,4,8,9,12-18,20-24 * abstract * * page 6, paragraph 4 * * page 7, paragraph 2 * * page 8, paragraph L * * examples 1,3 * * claims 1-15 *; | [A]WO9510259 (HENKEL KGAA [DE], et al) [A] 1-24 * the whole document * |