EP0741117 - Image writing on ceramics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.2001 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Change - representative | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/45] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chatterjee, Dilip K., c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Dep., 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Ghosh, Syamal K., c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Dep., 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 03 /
Shaffer, Wayne K., c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Dep., 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 04 /
Vankerhove, Alan P., c/o Eastman Kodak Co. Patent Dep., 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1996/45] | Representative(s) | Haile, Helen Cynthia Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Haile, Helen Cynthia Kodak Limited Patent Department (W160-G) Headstone Drive Harrow Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | ||
Former [1996/45] | Haile, Helen Cynthia Kodak Limited Patent Department Headstone Drive Harrow, Middlesex HA1 4TY / GB | Application number, filing date | 96200888.4 | 02.04.1996 | [1996/45] | Priority number, date | US19950417318 | 04.04.1995 Original published format: US 417318 | [1996/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0741117 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0741117 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C04B41/80, B41M1/34, B41M5/28, G03C1/725 | [1996/45] | CPC: |
C04B41/80 (EP,US);
B41M5/262 (EP,US);
B44C1/005 (EP,US);
C04B35/488 (EP,US);
C04B41/0036 (EP,US);
C04B41/009 (EP,US);
C04B2111/82 (EP,US);
G03C2200/39 (EP,US);
G03C5/16 (EP,US);
Y10S430/146 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/009, C04B35/48 (EP,US);
C04B41/009, C04B35/488 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1996/45] | Title | German: | Bilderaufzeichnung auf keramischen Materialien | [1996/45] | English: | Image writing on ceramics | [1996/45] | French: | Ecriture d'image sur céramiques | [1996/45] | Examination procedure | 07.04.1997 | Examination requested [1997/23] | 21.05.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 29.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2335571 (TEIJIN LTD) [A] 1,6 * page 4, line 14 - page 6, line 6 * * page 7, lines 4-20 * * claims 1,7,15 *; | [A]EP0233146 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, lines 20-30 * * page 2, lines 46-56 * * page 3, lines 4-6 * * page 3, lines 41-46 *; | [A]US5030551 (HERREN FRITZ [CH], et al) [A] 1,6* claims 1,13 *; | [AD]US5336282 (GHOSH SYAMAL K [US], et al) [AD] 1,6 * claims 1,2,5 * |