EP0747194 - Two-level injection moulding machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.09.2002 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 24.09.2008 [2008/39] | Applicant(s) | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | For:BE
CH
FR
GB
LI
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [2008/39] |
Former [2002/41] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH 20099 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:BE
CH
FR
GB
LI
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [2000/02] | For:DE
Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | ||
For:BE
CH
FR
GB
LI
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1999/20] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:BE
CH
FR
GB
LI
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1999/16] | For:DE
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH Wendenstrasse 35c 20097 Hamburg / DE | ||
For:BE
CH
FR
GB
LI
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | |||
Former [1996/50] | For:DE
Polygram Manufacturing & Distribution Centres GmbH Postfach 10 14 20 30835 Langenhagen / DE | ||
For:BE
CH
FR
GB
LI
Polygram International Holding B.V. Gerrit van der Veenlaan 4 3743 DN Baarn / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wilhelm, Henning Peiner Heerstrasse 42 31275 Lehrte/OT. Aligse / DE | [1996/50] | Representative(s) | von Laue, Hanns-Ulrich, et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH Postfach 50 04 42 52088 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1998/14] | von Laue, Hanns-Ulrich, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [1996/50] | Erdmann, Anton, Dipl.-Ing. Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24 22335 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96201549.1 | 04.06.1996 | [1996/50] | Priority number, date | DE1995120931 | 08.06.1995 Original published format: DE 19520931 | [1996/50] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0747194 | Date: | 11.12.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.09.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B29C45/12 | [1996/50] | CPC: |
B29C45/16 (EP,US);
B29C45/322 (EP,US);
Y10S425/81 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [1996/50] | Title | German: | Zweietagen-Spritzgiessmaschine | [1996/50] | English: | Two-level injection moulding machine | [1996/50] | French: | Machine à mouler par injection à deux étages | [1996/50] | Examination procedure | 11.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/33] | 20.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.05.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.01.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 30.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.05.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/46] | 14.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2002/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPS61185424 ; | [X]JPS61121912 ; | [XA]JPS62236717 ; | [X]WO9003878 (SORENSEN JENS OLE [US]) [X] 1,4 * page 13, line 7 - line 15; figure 2 *; | [XA]WO9508428 (ENGEL GMBH MASCHBAU [AT], et al) [X] 1 * figure 3; claim 4 * [A] 5,6; | [X]JPS62121024 ; | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870108), vol. 11, no. 6, Database accession no. (M - 551)<2453>, & JP61185424 A 19860819 (TOSHIBA MACH CO LTD) [X] 1,3 * abstract * [A] 4 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861023), vol. 10, no. 311, Database accession no. (M - 528)<2367>, & JP61121912 A 19860609 (SHOICHI TERAOKA) [X] 1 * abstract * | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880406), vol. 12, no. 105, Database accession no. (M - 681)<2952>, & JP62236717 A 19871016 (UBE IND LTD) [X] 1 * figure 8 * [A] 4 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19871106), vol. 11, no. 339, Database accession no. (M - 639)<2786>, & JP62121024 A 19870602 (SHOICHI TERAOKA) [X] 1 * abstract * | [X] - NACHTSHEIM E., "MIT ETAGENWERKZEUGEN KOSTENGUNSTIGER PRODUZIEREN", PLASTVERARBEITER, HEIDELBERG DE, (199506), vol. 46, no. 6, pages 50 - 52, 54, 56, XP000522417 [X] 1 * page 54, column R, paragraph 4 - page 56, column L, paragraph 1; figure 10 * |