EP0749716 - A method for installing a bath tub, and support device to be used therewith [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.1999 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.07.1999 [1999/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states J. van Walraven B.V. Industrieweg 5 3641 RK Mijdrecht / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states J. van Walraven B.V. Industrieweg 5 NL-3641 RK Mijdrecht / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Van den Hoed, Robert 60, Verlengde Singelstraat 2613 EW Delft / NL | 02 /
Nas, Deborah 74a, Vlamingstraat 2611 KZ Delft / NL | 03 /
Oudakker, Michiel 10, Houthaak 2611 LE Delft / NL | 04 /
Selders, Tim 237h, Mathenesserdijk 3027 BM Rotterdam / NL | [1996/52] | Representative(s) | Boelsma, Gerben Harm Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V. (EP&C) P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | Boelsma, Gerben Harm, Ir. van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 96201719.0 | 20.06.1996 | [1996/52] | Priority number, date | NL19951000625 | 21.06.1995 Original published format: NL 1000625 | [1996/52] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0749716 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.10.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A47K3/16 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
A47K3/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/52] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Befestigung einer Badewanne und Haltevorrichtung für diese Verwendung | [1996/52] | English: | A method for installing a bath tub, and support device to be used therewith | [1996/52] | French: | Méthode pour l'installation d'une baignoire et dispositif de support pour son utilisation | [1996/52] | Examination procedure | 25.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/35] | 05.01.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/30] | 05.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1999/30] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1998 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE9420783U (FERROPLAST GMBH) [DA] 1,2 * page 4, line 5 - page 5, line 6; figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE9409368U (MUECKE PETER) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0631754 (IDO KYLPYHUONE OY) [A] 1 * column 3, line 51 - column 4, line 26; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2180494 (BILLINGTON WILLIAM HENRY) |