EP0753406 - Auxiliary transport device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | For all designated states Heidelberger Druckmaschinen Aktiengesellschaft Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [1997/03] | For all designated states Heidelberg Contiweb B.V. P.O. Box 203 5830 AE Boxmeer / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Logtens, Gerardus Martinus Catharina Jozef 12, Gildestraat 5824 AB Holthees / NL | 02 /
Scheepens, Franciscus Gerardus Maria 3, L. Couperusstraat 5421 RG Gemert / NL | [1997/03] | Representative(s) | Fey, Hans-Jürgen, et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/17] | Fey, Hans-Jürgen, et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | ||
Former [1997/03] | Fey, Hans-Jürgen Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG Patentabteilung Kurfürsten-Anlage 52-60 69115 Heidelberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96201755.4 | 24.06.1996 | [1997/03] | Priority number, date | NL19951000740 | 06.07.1995 Original published format: NL 1000740 | [1997/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0753406 | Date: | 15.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0753406 | Date: | 06.06.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/03, F26B13/10 | [1997/03] | CPC: |
F26B13/107 (EP,US);
B41F13/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/03] | Title | German: | Hilfsantriebsvorrichtung | [1997/03] | English: | Auxiliary transport device | [1997/03] | French: | Dispositif de transport auxiliaire | [1997/03] | Examination procedure | 21.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/34] | 08.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.04.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.11.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.03.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.06.2001 | IT | 06.06.2001 | NL | 06.06.2001 | DK | 06.09.2001 | GB | 06.09.2001 | [2008/06] |
Former [2003/46] | AT | 06.06.2001 | |
NL | 06.06.2001 | ||
DK | 06.09.2001 | ||
GB | 06.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 06.06.2001 | |
NL | 06.06.2001 | ||
GB | 06.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/01] | AT | 06.06.2001 | |
GB | 06.09.2001 | ||
Former [2002/15] | AT | 06.06.2001 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2402768 (AUGSBURG-NÜRNBERG AG) [A] 1,9 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2357443 (FERAG AG [CH]) [A] 1,9* the whole document *; | [A]EP0152737 (ROLAND MAN DRUCKMASCH [DE]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document * |