EP0752533 - Spiral compressor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ATLAS COPCO AIRPOWER N.V. Boomsesteenweg 957 2610 Wilrijk / BE | [2001/35] |
Former [1997/02] | For all designated states ATLAS COPCO AIRPOWER N.V. Boomsesteenweg 957 B-2610 Wilrijk / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Callens, Michel Emile Odile Leugstraat 213 2630 Aartselaar / BE | 02 /
van der Taelen, Jozef Leopold Gebr. van Benedenlaan 35 2658 Puurs / BE | [1997/02] | Representative(s) | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv. Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/02] | Donné, Eddy Bureau M.F.J. Bockstael nv Arenbergstraat 13 2000 Antwerpen / BE | Application number, filing date | 96201783.6 | 27.06.1996 | [1997/02] | Priority number, date | BE19950000600 | 06.07.1995 Original published format: BE 9500600 | [1997/02] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0752533 | Date: | 08.01.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0752533 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F04C29/02, F04C18/02 | [1997/02] | CPC: |
F04C18/0215 (EP,US);
F04C29/028 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1997/02] | Title | German: | Spiralverdichter | [1997/02] | English: | Spiral compressor | [1997/02] | French: | Compresseur à spirales | [1997/02] | Examination procedure | 08.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/37] | 29.03.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.01.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB2025530 (LEYBOLD HERAEUS GMBH & CO KG) [Y] 1-3 * page 2, line 75 - line 111; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US4337984 (SHAFFER ROBERT W) [Y] 1-3 * column 1, line 38 - line 52 * * column 1, line 63 - column 2, line 50; figure - *; | [A]NL7600867 (AGINFOR AG) [A] 1 * page 10, line 8 - line 18; figure 3 *; | [A]GB2155549 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * page 3, line 35 - line 108; figure 4 *; | [A]JPH06317265 ; | [A]JPH06341384 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 940, no. 011, & JP06317265 A 19941115 (TOYOTA AUTOM LOOM WORKS LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 940, no. 012, & JP06341384 A 19941213 (KOBE STEEL) [A] * abstract * |