EP0758535 - Apparatus for attaching fabric to a chair frame [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.1998 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.05.1998 [1998/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BEMIS MANUFACTURING COMPANY 300 Mill Street, P.O. Box 901 Sheboygan Falls Wisconsin 53085-901 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/08] | For all designated states BEMIS MANUFACTURING COMPANY 300 Mill Street Sheboygan Falls, Wisconsin 53085-901 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hand, Joseph M. 436 Prospect Avenue, Sheboygan Falls Wisconsin 53085 / US | [1997/08] | Representative(s) | Krijgsman, Willem, et al DSM Intellectual Property Office Geleen P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [1997/08] | Krijgsman, Willem, et al Octrooibureau DSM, P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 96202210.9 | 06.08.1996 | [1997/08] | Priority number, date | US19950002218 | 11.08.1995 Original published format: US 2218 | [1997/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0758535 | Date: | 19.02.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | A47C31/02 | [1997/08] | CPC: |
A47C31/023 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1997/08] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Befestigung von Gewebe auf einem Stuhlgestell | [1997/08] | English: | Apparatus for attaching fabric to a chair frame | [1997/08] | French: | Dispositif pour fixer le tissu à un cadre de chaise | [1997/08] | Examination procedure | 20.08.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/19] | 10.12.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/19] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB820609 (GEN MOTORS CORP) [X] 1-6,11,12 * page 1, line 70 - page 2, line 115; figures 1-29 * [A] 7,15; | [XA]FR2265320 (COX OF WATFORD LTD [GB]) [X] 1 * page 3, line 1 - page 6, line 25; figures 1-8 * [A] 7,11-13,15-18,20; | [A]US5338091 (MILLER ELMO E [US]) [A] 1,4-6,11,12,15 * column 2, line 41 - column 3, line 64; figures 1-8 * | by applicant | US4552405 |