EP0750275 - Recording apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2001 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.2001 [2001/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mitsuhashi, Shunya Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kumada, Shuichi Canon K.K., 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [1996/52] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/52] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96202448.5 | 23.10.1990 | [1996/52] | Priority number, date | JP19890274831 | 24.10.1989 Original published format: JP 27483189 | JP19900051650 | 05.03.1990 Original published format: JP 5165090 | JP19900098347 | 12.04.1990 Original published format: JP 9834790 | [1996/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0750275 | Date: | 27.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0750275 | Date: | 04.02.1998 | [1998/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0750275 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G06K15/00 | [1996/52] | CPC: |
G06K15/02 (EP,US);
G06K15/00 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0011 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0025 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0031 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0062 (EP,US);
G06K2215/0094 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/52] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsgerät | [1996/52] | English: | Recording apparatus | [1996/52] | French: | Appareil d'enregistrement | [1996/52] | Examination procedure | 17.06.1998 | Examination requested [1998/34] | 11.08.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 02.06.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP90311628.3 / EP0425253 | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/31] | Request for further processing for: | 02.06.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 02.06.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 18.06.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS63254469 ; | [A]JPS61175818 ; | [A]JPS6427952 ; | [A]JPS6123470 ; | [A]JPH01184140 ; | [Y]EP0092747 (POLAROID CORP [US]) [Y] 1,6,7,10,42 * page 9, line 20 - page 11, line 14; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4515487 (MINAMI HITOSHI [JP]) [A] 1,9,10 * column 5, line 18 - column 6, line 50; figure 1 *; | [A]US4687334 (MIYAKAWA TADASHI [JP]) [A] 1,10,42 * column 2, line 3 - line 24; figure -; claim - * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890215), vol. 013, no. 066, Database accession no. (P - 828), & JP63254469 A 19881021 (RICOH CO LTD) [Y] 1,6,7,10,42 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861225), vol. 010, no. 387, Database accession no. (P - 530), & JP61175818 A 19860807 (FUJITSU LTD) [A] 1,5,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890515), vol. 013, no. 204, Database accession no. (M - 825), & JP01027952 A 19890130 (HITACHI LTD;OTHERS: 01) [A] 1,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860620), vol. 010, no. 175, Database accession no. (E - 413), & JP61023470 A 19860131 (FUJI XEROX KK) [A] 1,3,10 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19891024), vol. 013, no. 469, Database accession no. (M - 883), & JP01184140 A 19890721 (CANON INC) [A] 1,2,8,10 * abstract * |