EP0766273 - Transformer structure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.1998 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.1998 [1998/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yamamoto, Makoto 2525-1, Nishiharuchika, Ina Nagano / JP | [1997/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1997/14] | Representative(s) | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Senato 8 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1998/18] | Perani, Aurelio, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 20122 Milano / IT | ||
Former [1997/14] | Falcetti, Carlo, et al c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A. Via Visconti di Modrone, 7 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 96202687.8 | 26.09.1996 | [1997/14] | Priority number, date | JP19950277014 | 28.09.1995 Original published format: JP 27701495 | [1997/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0766273 | Date: | 02.04.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0766273 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H01F27/32, H01F27/08 | [1997/14] | CPC: |
H01F27/327 (EP);
H02B5/00 (KR);
H01F27/085 (EP);
H01F2027/328 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, SE [1997/14] | Title | German: | Transformatoraufbau | [1997/14] | English: | Transformer structure | [1997/14] | French: | Structure de transformateur | [1997/14] | Examination procedure | 17.01.1998 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/47] | 14.05.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2260833 (ELGE ERNEST A) [X] 1,3 * page 1, column R, line 36 - page 2, column L, line 10 * [Y] 2; | [A]DE1270167 (LICENTIA GMBH) [A] 1 * column 2, line 16 - line 34 *; | [Y]EP0619586 (YAMAMOTO MAKOTO [JP]) [Y] 2 * column 4, line 36 - line 58 *; | [A]US1703410 (SMITH FRANKLIN S); | [A]EP0075796 (TRANSFORMATOREN UNION AG [DE]); | [A]DE1138156 (LICENTIA GMBH); | [A]US5034716 (MOKADAM RAGHUNATH G [US]) |