EP0773325 - Manufactured article for marking areas adjacent to roadways for vehicles, particularly in the dark [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.02.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.02.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2000 [2000/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states R.P. Roberti & Paoletti S.r.l. Via Pigafetta, 4 61032 Fano (Pesaro) / IT | [1997/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Roberti, Lorenzo Viale Kennedy, 27 61032 Fano (Pesaro) / IT | 02 /
Ferrari, Alberto Via Antonelli, 44 00197 Roma / IT | [1997/20] | Representative(s) | Gardi, Giuliano Gardipatent, S.r.l., Via Giardini, 605 41100 Modena / IT | [N/P] |
Former [1997/20] | Gardi, Giuliano Gardipatent, S.r.l., Via Giardini, 605 41100 Modena / IT | Application number, filing date | 96202998.9 | 29.10.1996 | [1997/20] | Priority number, date | IT1995MO00154 | 08.11.1995 Original published format: IT MO950154 | [1997/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0773325 | Date: | 14.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.1997 | Classification | IPC: | E01F1/00, E01F9/053 | [1997/20] | CPC: |
E01F9/541 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1997/20] | Title | German: | Hergestellter Gegenstand zur Markierung von benachbarte Fläche von Fahrbahnen für Fahrzeuge, hauptsächlich sichtbar im Dunkeln | [1997/20] | English: | Manufactured article for marking areas adjacent to roadways for vehicles, particularly in the dark | [1997/20] | French: | Article fabriqué pour le marquage des zones adjacents des routes pour véhicules, particulièrement visible la nuit | [1997/20] | Examination procedure | 10.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/02] | 15.03.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/12] | 28.10.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.01.1997 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.1997 | 09.01.1997 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.1997 | 09.01.1997 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.1997 | 09.01.1997 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.1997 | 09.01.1997 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.1997 | 09.01.1997 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.1997 | 09.01.1997 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.1997 | 09.01.1997 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.1997 | 09.01.1997 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.1997 | 09.01.1997 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.1997 | 09.01.1997 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.1997 | 09.01.1997 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.1997 | 09.01.1997 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.1997 | 09.01.1997 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.1997 | 09.01.1997 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.1997 | 09.01.1997 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.1997 | 09.01.1997 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   16.01.1997 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.1999 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]BE487472 (L . REMACLE) [X] 1-4 * figure - *[A] 6-11,13-15; | [XAY]GB503505 (STUART MAYNARD LOVELL) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [A] 6-10 [Y] 12,14,15,17; | [XY]GB2165873 (MANBY MALCOLM) [X] 1-11,13 * page 1, line 121 - page 4, line 122; figure - * [Y] 12,14,15,17 |