EP0721767 - Endoprosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.03.2001 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIOMET Deutschland GmbH Alt-Lankwitz 102 12247 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | For all designated states BIOMET Deutschland GmbH Alt-Lankwitz 102 D-12247 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goymann, Volkmar, Prof. Dr. med. Forstmannstr. 62 D-45239 Essen / DE | 02 /
Anapliotis, Emmanuel Kiebitzweg 5 D-14195 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Darga, Jürgen Becherweg 21 D-13407 Berlin / DE | [1996/29] | Representative(s) | Maikowski, Michael, et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Postfach 15 09 20 10671 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/46] | Maikowski, Michael, Dipl.-Ing. Dr., et al Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann Xantener Strasse 10 10707 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1996/29] | Christiansen, Henning, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Pacelliallee 43/45 14195 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 96250002.1 | 08.01.1996 | [1996/29] | Priority number, date | DE1995101995 | 11.01.1995 Original published format: DE 19501995 | [1996/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0721767 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | DE | [1996/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0721767 | Date: | 16.07.1997 | [1997/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/36 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
A61F2/30724 (EP,US);
A61F2/3662 (EP,US);
A61F2/30767 (EP,US);
A61F2/367 (EP,US);
A61F2/3676 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30112 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30156 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30177 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30189 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30329 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30332 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30571 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30593 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30602 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30841 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30845 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30884 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30906 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3625 (EP,US);
A61F2002/3631 (EP,US);
A61F2002/365 (EP,US);
A61F2002/368 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0025 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0033 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0004 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0023 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0036 (EP,US);
A61F2230/0056 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00023 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00293 (EP,US);
A61F2310/00796 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [1996/29] | Title | German: | Endoprothese | [1996/29] | English: | Endoprosthesis | [1996/29] | French: | Endoprothèse | [1996/29] | Examination procedure | 23.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/21] | 05.07.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2001/18] | 28.08.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 30.11.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2001/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 26.02.1998 | M01   Fee paid on   23.03.1998 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.03.1998 | 31.01.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   21.04.1999 | 31.01.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2438469 (TORNIER SA ETS) [A] 1 * page 1, line 36 - page 2, line 9; figure - *; | [DA]EP0295200 (MECRON MED PROD GMBH [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]DE3743329 (KRUPP GMBH); | [A]FR2572274 (UNIV RENNES [FR]) |