EP0734960 - Dispensing closure [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.03.2002 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York NY 10022-7499 / US | ||
Former [1996/40] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, N.Y. 10022-7499 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Julemont, Jean 76 Fontaine au Biez 4802 Verviers / BE | 02 /
Connan, Patrick 19 Chrystal Drive Lebanon, New Jersey 08833 / US | [1996/40] | Representative(s) | Uexküll & Stolberg Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4 22607 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 96250065.8 | 20.03.1996 | [1996/40] | Priority number, date | US19950413584 | 30.03.1995 Original published format: US 413584 | [1996/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0734960 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0734960 | Date: | 18.12.1996 | [1996/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/20 | [1996/40] | CPC: |
B65D47/2031 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/40] | Title | German: | Ausgabeverschluss | [1996/40] | English: | Dispensing closure | [1996/40] | French: | Fermeture distributrice | [1996/40] | Examination procedure | 09.06.1997 | Examination requested [1997/32] | 08.04.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.10.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.09.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.12.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.10.2001 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/19] | 08.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2001 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US5213236 (BROWN PAUL E [US], et al) [DA] 1,8 * figures 1-14 *; | [DA]EP0586778 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [DA] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5307955 (VIEGAS FLEMING [CA]) |