EP0762339 - Tachograph arrangement [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2004 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spende, Peter Lützowstrasse 5 10785 Berlin / DE | For all designated states Kolley, Klaus Jakobstrasse 18 70839 Gerlingen / DE | [1997/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spende, Peter Lützowstr. 5 10785 Berlin / DE | [1997/11] | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/41] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner Anwaltssozietät GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [1999/46] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Pacelliallee 43/45 14195 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [1997/11] | Christiansen, Henning, Dipl.-Ing. Patentanwalt Pacelliallee 43/45 14195 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 96250185.4 | 29.08.1996 | [1997/11] | Priority number, date | DE19951033515 | 30.08.1995 Original published format: DE 19533515 | [1997/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0762339 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0762339 | Date: | 09.06.1999 | [1999/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G07C5/08 | [1997/11] | CPC: |
G07C5/0858 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1997/11] | Title | German: | Fahrtschreiberanordnung | [1997/11] | English: | Tachograph arrangement | [1997/11] | French: | Agencement de tachygraphe | [1997/11] | Examination procedure | 09.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/11] | 26.02.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/39] | 03.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.04.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.1999 | 31.08.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.02.2000 | 31.08.2000 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.11.2000 | 10.10.2001 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2002 | 31.08.2003 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0592166 (MATRA MARCONI SPACE UK LTD) [X] 1-9,14 * abstract * * column 1, line 36 - column 2, line 18 * * column 3, line 5 - line 49 * * column 5, line 9 - column 6, line 37 * * column 6, line 49 - column 7, line 2 * * column 7, line 33 - column 8, line 19 * * figures 1,2,4; claims 1,2 * [Y] 10-13,15,16; | [XA]US4644368 (MUTZ GERHARD) [X] 1-4 * abstract * * column 2, line 55 - column 3, line 2 * * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 38 * * column 5, line 62 - column 6, line 57 * * column 8, line 4 - line 19 * * column 9, line 46 - line 66 * * figures 1-5; claims 1-3 * [A] 5,7; | [Y]US5117096 (FLECKENSTEIN HUBERT ET AL) [Y] 10-13 * abstract * * column 2, line 18 - column 3, line 35 * * column 4, line 39 - line 53 * * column 5, line 23 - column 6, line 37 * * figures 1,5; claims 1-4 *; | [Y]US4982072 (TAKIGAMI HIROSHI) [Y] 15 * abstract * * column 1, line 45 - line 62 * * column 4, line 40 - line 64 *; | [Y]BE1003882 ((SUNGUR NAIM KEFOGLU ONDER)) [Y] 16 * page 1, line 26 - page 2, line 21 * * page 4, line 13 - line 27 * * page 8, line 5 - page 9, line L * * claims 1-4 *; | [A]US5043562 (HAUTVAST HEINZ-JOSEF ET AL) [A] 7 * abstract * * column 2, line 42 - line 64 * * column 3, line 58 - column 4, line 57; figures 1-5 * |