EP0763457 - Device for unlocking the lock coupling holder and the testing slide for points with ball screw drive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.08.2001 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2001 | Refusal of application | published on 10.10.2001 [2001/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1997/12] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schöning, Manfred Fridtjof-Nansen-Strasse 19 38108 Braunschweig / DE | 02 /
Eichner, Wilfried Birkenheg 40 38104 Braunschweig / DE | 03 /
Bolle, Wolfgang Söderhof 13a 38275 Haverlah / DE | 04 /
Sattler, Uwe Weichselweg 2 38108 Braunschweig / DE | [1997/12] | Application number, filing date | 96250189.6 | 05.09.1996 | [1997/12] | Priority number, date | DE1995135577 | 14.09.1995 Original published format: DE 19535577 | [1997/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0763457 | Date: | 19.03.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B61L5/10 | [1997/12] | CPC: |
B61L5/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FI, LI [1997/12] | Title | German: | Einrichtung zum Entriegeln des Festhaltekupplungsgehäuses und der Prüferschieber von Weichenantrieben mit Kugelspindeltrieben | [1997/12] | English: | Device for unlocking the lock coupling holder and the testing slide for points with ball screw drive | [1997/12] | French: | Dispositif de déverrouillage du boîtier de couplage de verrouillage et de la barre de test pour aiguillages à entraînement par vis à billes | [1997/12] | Examination procedure | 21.01.1997 | Examination requested [1997/15] | 27.10.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2001/41] | 14.05.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2001/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]CH621168 (TELEFONAKTIEBOLAGET L M ERICSSON) [A] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0289978 (ALSTHOM) [A] 1 * column W *; | [A]EP0317927 (ALSTHOM) [A] 1 * column W * |