EP0788073 - Device for printing a printing support standing on an edge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.08.2002 [2002/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Francotyp-Postalia AG & Co. KG Triftweg 21-26 16547 Birkenwerder / DE | [2002/28] |
Former [1997/32] | For all designated states Francotyp-Postalia Aktiengesellschaft & Co. Triftweg 21-26 16547 Birkenwerder / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geserich, Frank Plantagenstrasse 11 13347 Berlin / DE | 02 /
von Inten, Wolfgang Jägerweg 30 13503 Berlin / DE | [1997/32] | Application number, filing date | 96250285.2 | 09.12.1996 | [1997/32] | Priority number, date | DE1996105015 | 31.01.1996 Original published format: DE 19605015 | DE1996145363 | 25.10.1996 Original published format: DE 19645363 | [1997/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0788073 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | Language: | DE | [1997/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0788073 | Date: | 03.02.1999 | [1999/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0788073 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00 | [1997/32] | CPC: |
B41J13/12 (EP,US);
G07B17/00467 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1997/32] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Bedrucken eines auf einer Kante stehenden Druckträgers | [1997/32] | English: | Device for printing a printing support standing on an edge | [1997/32] | French: | Dispositif pour imprimer un support d'impression debout sur un bord | [1997/32] | Examination procedure | 15.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/19] | 12.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.03.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.04.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 02.04.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9001742 (AUTOMATED IDENTIFIC SYSTEMS [US]) [A] 1,2,4,6 * page 12, line 1 - page 13, line 2 * * page 14, line 1 - page 16, line 24; figure - *; | [A]WO9004824 (AUTOMATED IDENTIFIC SYST INC [US]) [A] 1,2,6 * page 11, line 7 - page 13, line 27; figure - *; | [A]GB2272401 (Z MARK INT INC [GB]) [A] 1,2 * page 7, line 8 - page 9, line 28; figure - *; | [A]US5467709 (SALOMON JAMES A [US]) | by applicant | US5025386 | US5467709 |