EP0723133 - Removable bullet resistant apparatus for vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 24.03.2000 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2000 | Refusal of application | published on 10.05.2000 [2000/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Madden, James R., Jr. 4410 W. Acoma Drive Glendale Arizona 85306 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/30] | For all designated states Madden, James R., Jr. 4410 W. Acoma Drive Glendale, Arizona 85306 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1996/30] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/30] | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 96300170.6 | 10.01.1996 | [1996/30] | Priority number, date | US19950375720 | 20.01.1995 Original published format: US 375720 | [1996/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0723133 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0723133 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | [1997/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F41H7/04, F41H5/04, F41H5/013 | [1996/30] | CPC: |
F41H5/263 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [1996/30] | Title | German: | Abnehmbare Panzerplatte für Autos | [1996/30] | English: | Removable bullet resistant apparatus for vehicles | [1996/30] | French: | Plaque de blindage amovible pour véhicules | [1996/30] | Examination procedure | 10.10.1997 | Examination requested [1997/50] | 29.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 03.11.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2000/19] | 13.11.1999 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2000/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.07.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.09.1997 | M01   Fee paid on   10.10.1997 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1998 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   14.07.1998 | 31.01.1999 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.07.1999 | 31.01.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3855898 (MCDONALD W) [AD] 1,10* column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 20; figures 6,7,7A * |