EP0726696 - Power factor circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.11.2002 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2003 [2003/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
El-Hamamsy, Sayed-Amr Ahmes 2120 Van Rensselaer Drive Schenectady, New York 12308 / US | 02 /
Kachmarik, David J. 26656 Waterbury Circle North Olmsted, Ohio 44070 / US | 03 /
Kheraluwala, Mustansir Hussain 135 No. A4 Hillcrest Village Apartments Schenectady, New York 12309 / US | [1996/33] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al London Patent Operation, GE Technical Services Co. Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96300216.7 | 11.01.1996 | [1996/33] | Priority number, date | US19950386572 | 10.02.1995 Original published format: US 386572 | [1996/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0726696 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0726696 | Date: | 21.05.1997 | [1997/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.1997 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/295 | [2002/07] | CPC: |
H02M1/4241 (EP,US);
H05B41/28 (EP,US);
Y02B70/10 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/33] | H05B41/29 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/33] | Title | German: | Leistungsfaktor Verbesserungsschaltung | [1996/33] | English: | Power factor circuit | [1996/33] | French: | Circuit correcteur de facteur de puissance | [1996/33] | Examination procedure | 21.11.1997 | Examination requested [1998/04] | 21.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.08.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/03] | 10.09.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0479196 (TOSHIBA LIGHTING & TECHNOLOGY [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,8 * figures 3,10 *; | [XP]EP0667734 (MAGNETEK SPA [IT]) [XP] 1-12 * column 3, line 8 - column 3, line 13 * * column 4, line 22 - column 4, line 31; figures 1-3,8 *; | [A]DE4400436 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1,4,5,7,8 * figures 20,21 *; | [E]WO9607297 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [E] 1 * page 2, line 13 - page 2, line 22; figure 1 * | by applicant | US5408403 | US4642745 | US4782268 | US4808887 | US5008597 | US4808807 | US19950386570 |