EP0721908 - Sheet folding method and apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.08.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2000 [2000/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states F.L. Smithe Machine Company, Inc. 899 Old Route 220 North Duncansville Pennsylvania 16635 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/29] | For all designated states F.L. Smithe Machine Company, Inc. 899 Old Route 220 North Duncansville, Pennsylvania 16635 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Smithe, Eliot S. 2 Cedar Heights Duncansville, PA 16635 / US | 02 /
Gardiner, John W. 550 Valleyview Drive Duncansville, PA 16635 / US | [1996/29] | Representative(s) | Thomas, Roger Tamlyn, et al D. Young & Co. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | [1996/29] | Application number, filing date | 96300259.7 | 15.01.1996 | [1996/29] | Priority number, date | US19950372770 | 13.01.1995 Original published format: US 372770 | [1996/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0721908 | Date: | 17.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0721908 | Date: | 24.07.1996 | [1996/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65H45/22, B31B19/36 | [1996/29] | CPC: |
B65H45/22 (EP,US);
B31B70/36 (EP,US);
B65H2701/1916 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB [1996/29] | Title | German: | Blattfaltverfahren und Vorrichtung | [1996/29] | English: | Sheet folding method and apparatus | [1996/29] | French: | Procédé et appareil de pliage de feuilles | [1996/29] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/49] | 15.11.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/39] | 26.04.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]US4994010 (DODERER-WINKLER ALFRED [DE]) [DA] 1,5,8,14,17,18 * column 4, line 3 - line 40; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR372027 (MEHLE ET AL) [A] 1,5,8,14,17,18 * the whole document *; | [DA]US5094658 (SMITHE ELLIOT S [US], et al) [DA] 1,5,14,18 * column 3, line 20 - column 4, line 33; figures 1-6 *; | [A]CH444650 (BOBST FILS SA J [CH]) [A] 1,14 * column 3, line 3 - column 4, line 28; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR641111 (NOISELESS LETTER FOLDER COMPAN) [A] 1,14,18 * the whole document *; | [A]US2088805 (OLM OSCAR J, et al) [A] 1,14,18 * page 3, line 5 - line 31; figures 1,2,4,11 *; | [A]US2540844 (STRAUSS ORVILLE L) [A] 1,2,5,14,18 * column W *; | [PA]EP0644065 (MOLL RICHARD JOSEPH [US]) [PA] 1,2,5-8,14,18 * column W * |