EP0728980 - Fluid quick connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.1999 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.11.1999 [1999/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BUNDY CORPORATION 12345 East Nine Mile Road Warren Michigan 48090-2001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | For all designated states BUNDY CORPORATION 12345 East Nine Mile Road Warren Michigan 48090-2001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kujawski, Rick A. 18283 Kandt Macomb, Michigan 48044 / US | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Watts, Peter Graham Anthony Cundy & Co. 39/41 South Drive Sutton Coldfield West Midlands B75 7TE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/35] | Watts, Peter Graham Anthony Cundy & Co., 1623 Warwick Road Knowle, Solihull, West Midlands B93 9LF / GB | Application number, filing date | 96300342.1 | 17.01.1996 | [1996/35] | Priority number, date | US19950392498 | 23.02.1995 Original published format: US 392498 | [1996/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0728980 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.1996 | Classification | IPC: | F16L37/084 | [1996/35] | CPC: |
F16L37/1225 (EP,KR,US);
F16L37/0985 (EP,KR,US);
Y10S285/921 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1996/35] | Title | German: | Schnellverbindung für Flüssigkeiten | [1996/35] | English: | Fluid quick connector | [1996/35] | French: | Raccord rapide pour fluides | [1996/35] | Examination procedure | 17.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 30.06.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.12.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 05.02.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.05.1999 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1999/46] | 21.06.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1999/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5002315 (BARTHOLOMEW DONALD D [US]) [X] 1-4,11,13 * column 2, line 32 - column 4, line 9; figures 2,4,5,8 *; | [A]US5368275 (KETCHAM MARK G [US], et al); | [A]US5226679 (KLINGER GARY [US]); | [A]US5378025 (SZABO GEORGE [US]) |