EP0726508 - Real time clock suitable for a mobile telephone [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.04.2003 [2003/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2002/11] |
Former [1996/33] | For all designated states NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD. P.O. Box 86 SF-24101 Salo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frampton, Simon 46 Quail Gardens, Selsdon Vale South Croydon, Surrey CR2 8TF / GB | [1996/33] | Representative(s) | Haws, Helen Louise, et al Nokia IPR Department Nokia (UK) Limited Summit Avenue Southwood Farnborough Hampshire GU14 0NZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | Haws, Helen Louise, et al Nokia Mobile Phones, Patent Department, St. Georges Court/St. Georges Road, 9 High Street Camberley, Surrey GU15 3QZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 96300471.8 | 24.01.1996 | [1996/33] | Priority number, date | GB19950002350 | 07.02.1995 Original published format: GB 9502350 | [1996/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0726508 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0726508 | Date: | 10.04.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G04G7/02, H04Q7/32 | [1996/33] | CPC: |
H04W52/029 (EP,US);
G04R40/02 (EP,US);
G04R40/06 (EP,US);
H04W56/0035 (EP,US);
Y02D30/70 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1996/33] | Title | German: | Echtzeituhr geeignet für ein Mobiltelefon | [1996/33] | English: | Real time clock suitable for a mobile telephone | [1996/33] | French: | Horloge en temps réel pour téléphone mobil | [1996/33] | Examination procedure | 14.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/16] | 23.01.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.07.1998 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.08.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.07.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 11.06.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 12.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14] | Request for further processing for: | 14.08.1998 | Request for further processing filed | 14.08.1998 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.08.1998 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0586256 (NOKIA MOBILE PHONES LTD [FI]) [X] 1,6,10 * column 2, line 27 - line 58 * * column 3, line 26 - line 30 * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 6 * [A] 11,12; | [Y]EP0635941 (SAGEM [FR]) [Y] 1 * column 5, line 6 - column 6, line 7; figure 4 *; | [Y]US4114363 (IMAMURA YOICHI) [Y] 1 * column 1, line 21 - line 26 * * column 1, line 33 - line 37 * * column 1, line 56 - column 2, line 12 * * column 5, line 1 - line 17 * * column 5, line 26 - line 38; figure 4 *; | [A]EP0619685 (NEC CORP [JP]) [A] 1,10 * column 2, line 22 - line 42 * * column 3, line 18 - line 47 * * column 4, line 4 - line 39 *; | [PX]GB2288899 (NEC CORP [JP]) [PX] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP0305200 (PRECISION STANDARD TIME INC [US]); | [A]EP0565180 (PHILIPS ELECTRONICS UK LTD [GB], et al) |