EP0724188 - Photographic printing and developing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 10.04.2002 [2002/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NORITSU KOKI CO., LTD. 579-1 Umehara Wakayama-shi Wakayama / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | For all designated states NORITSU KOKI CO., LTD. 579-1 Umehara Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP | ||
Former [1996/31] | For all designated states NORITSU KOKI CO. LTD 579-1 Umehara Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nishikawa, Hidetoshi c/o Noritsu Koki Co. Ltd., 579-1, Umehara Wakayama-shi, Wakayama / JP | [1996/31] | Representative(s) | Hillier, Peter, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/31] | Hillier, Peter, et al Reginald W. Barker & Co., Chancery House, 53-64, Chancery Lane London, WC2A 1QU / GB | Application number, filing date | 96300532.7 | 25.01.1996 | [1996/31] | Priority number, date | JP19950012652 | 30.01.1995 Original published format: JP 1265295 | JP19950263244 | 11.10.1995 Original published format: JP 26324495 | [1996/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0724188 | Date: | 31.07.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0724188 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G03B27/46, G03D3/13 | [1996/31] | CPC: |
G03B27/32 (EP,US);
G03B27/00 (KR);
B65H29/60 (KR);
G03B27/46 (KR);
G03D13/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI [1996/31] | Title | German: | Fotografisches Kopier- und Entwicklungsgerät | [1996/31] | English: | Photographic printing and developing apparatus | [1996/31] | French: | Dispositif photographique d'impression et de développement | [1996/31] | Examination procedure | 15.10.1996 | Examination requested [1996/50] | 14.12.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.09.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GB | 25.01.2001 | [2002/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4416529 (KASTL ALFONS [DE]) [A] 1* column W *; | [Y]FR2678747 (TODRANI RENE [FR]) [Y] 1,2,5,8 * page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 10 * * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 12; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]EP0629915 (NORITSU KOKI CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1,2,5,8 * column 3, line 14 - column 4, line 42; figure 1 * | Examination | EP0629904 |