EP0726210 - Carrier and package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.08.1999 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.1999 [1999/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Illinois Tool Works Inc. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, IL 60026 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | For all designated states ILLINOIS TOOL WORKS INC. 3600 West Lake Avenue Glenview, Illinois 60025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weaver, William N. 2625 Quail Lane-Northbrook Illinois 60062 / US | 02 /
Samaras, Peter L. 513 Northport Drive Elk Grove Village, Illinois 60007 / US | [1996/33] | Representative(s) | Rackham, Stephen Neil Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | Rackham, Stephen Neil GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96300777.8 | 02.02.1996 | [1996/33] | Priority number, date | US19950386546 | 10.02.1995 Original published format: US 386546 | [1996/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0726210 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0726210 | Date: | 21.10.1998 | Language: | EN | [1998/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65D71/50 | [1996/33] | CPC: |
B65D71/504 (EP,US);
B65D71/02 (KR);
B65D2203/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1996/33] | Title | German: | Träger und Packung | [1996/33] | English: | Carrier and package | [1996/33] | French: | Dispositif de portage et emballage | [1996/33] | Examination procedure | 07.02.1997 | Examination requested [1997/15] | 04.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.04.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.07.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 09.07.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]US4557375 (WEAVER WILLIAM N [US], et al) [DY] 4,5* figure - *; | [XY]WO8702330 (BLACHON GEORGES) [X] 1-3,6-9 * the whole document * [Y] 4,5; | [XY]EP0322312 (CONDITIONNEMENT ET IND S A C E [FR]) [X] 1-3,9,10 * column W * [Y] 4,5 |