EP0726286 - Rearrangement of polyorganosiloxanes using sulfonated polyethylene as catalyst [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2000 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.12.2000 [2000/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cabasso, Israel 131 Buckingham Avenue Syracuse, New York / US | 02 /
Graiver, Daniel 2355 Perrine Road Midland, Michigan / US | [1996/33] | Representative(s) | Hall, Marina, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | Dowden, Marina, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House, 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 96300834.7 | 07.02.1996 | [1996/33] | Priority number, date | US19950386040 | 09.02.1995 Original published format: US 386040 | [1996/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0726286 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0726286 | Date: | 02.07.1997 | [1997/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08G77/10 | [1996/33] | CPC: |
C08G77/10 (EP,US);
C08G77/08 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/33] | Title | German: | Umlagerung von Polyorganosiloxanen unter Verwendung von sulfoniertem Polyethylen als Katalysator | [1996/33] | English: | Rearrangement of polyorganosiloxanes using sulfonated polyethylene as catalyst | [1996/33] | French: | Réarrangement de polyorganosiloxanes en utilisant du polyéthylène sulfoné comme catalyseur | [1996/33] | Examination procedure | 30.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/40] | 29.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.05.2000 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2000/50] | 12.07.2000 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2000/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.12.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2000 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | CN1056502 [ ] (NO 1 BRANCH OF CHENGUANG CHEMI [CN]); | [DY]US4310679 (FINKE ULRICH, et al) [DY] 1-6 * column 1 - column 2 * * claim - *; | [A]US4222952 (VICK STEVEN C) [A] 1-6 * column 1, line 1 - line 49 * * claims 1,10 *; | [A]US3322722 (EYNON BENJAMIN A) [A] 1-6 * claims 1,3,4 * | [XY] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920629), vol. 116, no. 26, Database accession no. 256312, XP002030022 [X] 1,2 * abstract * [Y] 1-6 |