EP0726236 - Ceramic jig for hot rolling and method for manufacturing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.07.2001 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.07.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.08.2001 [2001/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-Cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawasaki, Keiji Guroriase Chiryu 3, 704, 37-5 Douseyama Aizuma-cho, Chiryu-city, Aichi-pref.472 / JP | 02 /
Miwa, Shinichi 25, Kibougaoka 1-chome Tajima-city, Gifu-prefecture, 507 / JP | [1996/33] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 96300857.8 | 08.02.1996 | [1996/33] | Priority number, date | JP19950022030 | 09.02.1995 Original published format: JP 2203095 | [1996/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0726236 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0726236 | Date: | 17.09.1997 | [1997/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0726236 | Date: | 06.09.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/587, B21B27/00 | [1996/46] | CPC: |
C04B41/009 (EP,KR,US);
C04B35/584 (EP,KR,US);
C04B41/0072 (EP,KR,US);
C04B41/72 (KR);
C04B41/80 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
C04B41/0072, C04B41/4519 (EP,US);
C04B41/009, C04B35/584 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [1996/33] | C04B35/587 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [1996/33] | Title | German: | Keramische Einspannvorrichtung zum Warmwalzen und Verfahren zur Herstellung derselben | [1996/33] | English: | Ceramic jig for hot rolling and method for manufacturing the same | [1996/33] | French: | Appareil de serrage en céramique pour laminer à chaud et procédé de sa fabrication | [1996/33] | Examination procedure | 24.09.1997 | Examination requested [1997/48] | 04.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.02.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.01.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4756180 (HIGUCHI MATSUO [JP], et al) [A] 1-6 * column 2, paragraph 3; claim 1; tables 1,6 *; | [A]EP0247718 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-5,7-11 * column 2, line 22 - line 35; examples 1,2; claims 1-7; table 2 *; | [A]US5089449 (MIWA SHINICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-3,5,7,10,11 * example 1; claims 1-7; table 1 * |