EP0726537 - Method and system for constraint checking bulk data in a database [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.09.1997 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.1997 [1997/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states International Business Machines Corporation Armonk, NY 10504 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | For all designated states INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION Armonk, NY 10504 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cochrane, Roberta J. 52 Chester Street Los Gatos, California 95030 / US | 02 /
Pirahesh, Mir H. 1282 Quail Creek Circle San Jose, California 95120 / US | 03 /
Sidle, Richard S. 141 Davisville Avenue, Apt. 1712 Toronto, Ontario M4S 1G7 / CA | 04 /
Zuzarte, Calisto P. 1625 Fairfield Crescent Pickering, Ontario L1V 6H2 / CA | [1996/33] | Representative(s) | Jennings, Michael John IBM United Kingdom Limited Intellectual Property Department Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/33] | Jennings, Michael John IBM United Kingdom Limited, Intellectual Property Department, Hursley Park Winchester, Hampshire SO21 2JN / GB | Application number, filing date | 96300875.0 | 09.02.1996 | [1996/33] | Priority number, date | US19950387037 | 10.02.1995 Original published format: US 387037 | [1996/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0726537 | Date: | 14.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.1996 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [1996/33] | CPC: |
G06F16/284 (EP,US);
Y10S707/99932 (US);
Y10S707/99934 (US);
Y10S707/99942 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/33] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System um Bedingungen für Massen von Daten in einer Datenbank zu überprüfen | [1996/33] | English: | Method and system for constraint checking bulk data in a database | [1996/33] | French: | Procédé et système pour vérifier des contraintes pour des grandes quantités de données dans une base de données | [1996/33] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 15.02.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/46] | 10.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1997/46] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0351209 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,15 * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 13 *; | [A]EP0399744 (IBM [US]) [A] 1,15* page 2, column 1, line 1 - page 3, column 2, line 8 *; | [A] - EBERHARD R ET AL, "DB2 referential integrity performance", INFO DB, SPRING 1989, USA, ISSN 0891-6004, vol. 4, no. 1, pages 13 - 19, XP000571335 [A] 1,15 * page 13, column 1, line 1 - page 13, column 1, line 53 * |