EP0727471 - LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAYS AND THEIR MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1996/34] | Adhesive compositions for liquid crystal displays, their preparation and use | ||
[1999/37] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2001 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.03.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2001 [2001/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/19] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [1996/34] | For all designated states Bridgestone Corporation 10-1, Kyobashi 1-Chome, Chuo-Ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morimura, Yasuhiro 3-4-7-402, Ogawahigashi-cho Kodaira-shi, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kotsubo, Hidefumi 3-5-5-852, Ogawahigashi-cho Kodaira-shi, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Yoshida, Kyouei 1145-3, Mogusa Tama-shi, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Sasaki, Kiyomi 156-19, Kamiyamaguchi Tokorozawa-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [1996/34] | Representative(s) | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/34] | Stoner, Gerard Patrick, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 96301017.8 | 14.02.1996 | [1996/34] | Priority number, date | JP19950049187 | 14.02.1995 Original published format: JP 4918795 | JP19950049188 | 14.02.1995 Original published format: JP 4918895 | [1996/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0727471 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0727471 | Date: | 04.03.1998 | [1998/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0727471 | Date: | 10.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.01.1998 | Classification | IPC: | C09J133/00, C09J135/00, G09F9/35, G02F1/1335 | [1998/10] | CPC: |
C09J133/062 (EP,US);
C09J123/0853 (EP,US);
C09J123/0869 (EP,US);
C09J123/0876 (EP,US);
C09J123/0884 (EP,US);
C09J4/06 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C09J4/06, C08F255/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/34] | C09J133/00, C09J135/00, G09F9/35 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1996/34] | Title | German: | Flüssigkristallanzeigen und ihre Herstellung | [1999/37] | English: | LIQUID CRYSTAL DISPLAYS AND THEIR MANUFACTURE | [1999/37] | French: | Dispositifs indicateurs à cristaux liquides et leur fabrication | [1999/37] |
Former [1996/34] | Klebstoffzusammensetzungen für Flüssigkristallanzeigen, ihre Herstellung und Verwendung | ||
Former [1996/34] | Adhesive compositions for liquid crystal displays, their preparation and use | ||
Former [1996/34] | Compositions adhésives pour dispositifs indicateurs liquidocristalliques, leur fabrication et leur utilisation | Examination procedure | 29.04.1998 | Examination requested [1998/27] | 13.11.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.03.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4715686 (IWASHITA YUKIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,10 * example -; claim - *; | [X]JPS62226124 ; | [A]US4264168 (BALIOZIAN MARDICK) [A] 1,10 * example -; claim - * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 87, no. 45, Database accession no. 87-317744, XP002056948 & JPS62226124 A 00000000 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * |