EP0729180 - Packaging multi-chip modules without wirebond interconnection [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2004 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.04.2004 [2004/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AT&T Corp. 32 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10013-2412 / US | [1996/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Degani, Yinon 10 Cleveland Avenue Highland Park, New Jersey 08904 / US | 02 /
Dudderar, Thomas D. 30 School Avenue Chatham, New Jersey 07928 / US | 03 /
Han, Byung J. 76 Country Club Lane Scotch Plains, New Jersey 07076 / US | 04 /
Lyons, Alan M. 28 Morehouse Place New Providence, New Jersey 07974 / US | 05 /
Tai, King L. 95 Highland Circle Berkeley Heights, New Jersey 07922 / US | [1996/35] | Representative(s) | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/19] | Williams, David John, et al Page White & Farrer, 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | ||
Former [1996/35] | Johnston, Kenneth Graham, et al Lucent Technologies (UK) Ltd, 5 Mornington Road Woodford Green Essex, IG8 OTU / GB | Application number, filing date | 96301025.1 | 14.02.1996 | [1996/35] | Priority number, date | US19950393628 | 24.02.1995 Original published format: US 393628 | [1996/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0729180 | Date: | 28.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0729180 | Date: | 11.11.1998 | [1998/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0729180 | Date: | 23.04.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/31, H01L23/13, H05K1/14 | [1998/44] | CPC: |
H01L23/3107 (EP,US);
H05K3/30 (KR);
H01L23/13 (EP,US);
H01L23/147 (EP,US);
H01L23/4985 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16145 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48465 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73207 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01019 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01322 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10253 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15151 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15321 (EP,US);
H01L2924/157 (EP,US);
H01L2924/16152 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48227 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48465, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/45099 (EP,US);
H01L2924/10253, H01L2924/00 (EP,US); |
Former IPC [1996/35] | H01L23/31, H01L23/13 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/35] | Title | German: | Verpacken von Multi-Chip-Modulen ohne Drahtverbindung | [1996/35] | English: | Packaging multi-chip modules without wirebond interconnection | [1996/35] | French: | Empaquetage de modules à multi-puces sans interconnexion à fil | [1996/35] | Examination procedure | 30.04.1999 | Examination requested [1999/26] | 13.12.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.11.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 21.11.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]JPH0513659 ; | [A]GB2098398 (HONEYWELL LTD) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2535110 (RADIOTECHNIQUE COMPELEC [FR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XA]GB2188485 (WESTERN DIGITAL CORP) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-15; | [XA]EP0491161 (BALL CORP [US]) [X] 1,13 * figures 1,2 * [A] 2-12,14,15; | [XA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930527), vol. 017, no. 276, Database accession no. (E - 1372), & JP05013659 A 19930122 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 1,13 * abstract * [A] 2-12,14,15 | [A] - "DIRECT ATTACHMENT OF A SILICON CARRIER FOR IC CHIPS TO A CIRCUIT CARD", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (198909), vol. 32, no. 4A, pages 93 - 95, XP000044995 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |