EP0727891 - Information data transmission with or without error correction code transmission according to channel quality [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.12.2003 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.12.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.02.2004 [2004/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2003/07] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | ||
Former [1996/34] | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku, Tokyo 108-01 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kushita, Masayuki c/o NEC Corp. 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [1996/34] | Representative(s) | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/34] | Moir, Michael Christopher, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96301033.5 | 15.02.1996 | [1996/34] | Priority number, date | JP19950049295 | 15.02.1995 Original published format: JP 4929595 | [1996/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0727891 | Date: | 21.08.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0727891 | Date: | 09.09.1998 | [1998/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0727891 | Date: | 12.02.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/12, H03M13/00 | [1998/37] | CPC: |
H04L1/0071 (EP,US);
H04L1/22 (KR);
H04L1/0002 (EP,US);
H04L1/0009 (EP,US);
H04L1/0026 (EP,US);
H04L1/1671 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1996/34] | H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/34] | Title | German: | Informationsdatenübertragung mit oder ohne Fehlerverbesserungskode der Kanalqualität entsprechend | [1996/34] | English: | Information data transmission with or without error correction code transmission according to channel quality | [1996/34] | French: | Transmission de données d'information avec ou sans code correcteur d'erreurs en fonction de la qualité du canal | [1996/34] | Examination procedure | 06.08.1998 | Examination requested [1998/41] | 23.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.08.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.10.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.10.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.11.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4047151 (RYDBECK NILS R C, et al) [X] 1 * column 1, lines 9-15 * * column 2, lines 7-40 * * sentences 34-40 * * claims 1-3,7 *; | [XY]EP0008016 (IBM [US]) [X] 1-3,6,9,10 * abstract * [Y] 4,5,7,8; | [Y]EP0154565 (CODEX CORP [US]) [Y] 4,5,7,8 * column A; claims 1,3,13 *; | [E]WO9745976 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [E] 1-3 * page 3, lines 6-22 * * page 7; table 1 * * claims 1-4 ** figure 2 * |