EP0729894 - Closure device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2000 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2003 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): NL | published on 26.02.2003 [2003/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MASSMOULD HOLDINGS LIMITED Maulden Road Flitwick Bedfordshire, MK45 5BZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | For all designated states MASSMOULD HOLDINGS LIMITED Maulden Road Flitwick, Bedfordshire, MK45 5BZ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McNaughton, Chris Maulden Road Flitwick, Bedfordshire MK45 5BZ / GB | [1996/36] | Representative(s) | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1998/24] | Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | ||
Former [1996/36] | Watkins, David, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96301179.6 | 22.02.1996 | [1996/36] | Priority number, date | GB19950004262 | 03.03.1995 Original published format: GB 9504262 | [1996/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0729894 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0729894 | Date: | 12.02.1997 | [1997/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0729894 | Date: | 04.08.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/34 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
B65D41/3409 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/36] | Title | German: | Verschlussvorrichtung | [1996/36] | English: | Closure device | [1996/36] | French: | Dispositif de fermeture | [1996/36] | Examination procedure | 30.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/40] | 01.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.04.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.01.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98114045.2 / EP0882656 | Opposition(s) | 05.05.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.08.1999 | NL | 04.08.1999 | [2003/09] |
Former [2000/24] | BE | 04.08.1999 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0229206 (EWIT S A) [X] 1-3,5 * column 1, paragraph 1 * * column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 5 * * column 3, line 40 - column 4, line 4; figure - * [Y] 4,6-11; | [YA]EP0365136 (JOHNSEN JORGENSEN PLASTICS LTD) [Y] 4,9-11 * the whole document * [A] 1,5; | [YA]FR2339541 (ASTRA PLASTIQUE) [Y] 6-8 * the whole document * [A] 1; | [DXY]WO9418085 (MOULAGE AUTOMATIQUE SA) [DX] 1,11 * the whole document * [Y] 9,10; | [YA]EP0080846 (JOHNSEN JORGENSEN PLASTICS LTD) [Y] 9,10 * the whole document * [A] 1,5,6,11; | [X]AU480881B (THE METAL BOX COMPANY) [X] 1,3 * the whole document *; | [A]US2961119 (LEACH) [A] 1,10 * figure - *; | [DA]GB1457991 (HIDDING W E) [DA] 1,5 * figure - * |