EP0730386 - Color format conversion in a parallel processor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.07.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.2006 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 09.08.2006 [2006/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC. 2550 Garcia Avenue Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [1996/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zhou, Chang-Guo 20333 Bollinger Road Cupertino, California 95014 / US | 02 /
Rice, Daniel S. 5838 Birch Court, No. F Oakland, California 94618 / US | [1996/36] | Representative(s) | Johnson, Terence Leslie Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/36] | Johnson, Terence Leslie Edward Evans & Co. Chancery House 53-64 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1SD / GB | Application number, filing date | 96301431.1 | 01.03.1996 | [1996/36] | Priority number, date | US19950398111 | 03.03.1995 Original published format: US 398111 | [1996/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0730386 | Date: | 04.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0730386 | Date: | 26.08.1998 | [1998/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0730386 | Date: | 15.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.07.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/64 | [1996/36] | CPC: |
H04N9/641 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL, SE [1996/36] | Title | German: | Farbformatumwandlung in einem Parallelprozessor | [1996/36] | English: | Color format conversion in a parallel processor | [1996/36] | French: | Conversion de format de couleur dans un processeur parallèle | [1996/36] | Examination procedure | 22.02.1999 | Examination requested [1999/16] | 10.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 15.09.2004 | NL | 15.09.2004 | SE | 15.12.2004 | DE | 16.12.2004 | GB | 01.03.2005 | [2006/32] |
Former [2006/14] | NL | 15.09.2004 | |
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
DE | 16.12.2004 | ||
GB | 01.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | NL | 15.09.2004 | |
SE | 15.12.2004 | ||
DE | 16.12.2004 | ||
GB | 01.03.2005 | ||
Former [2006/03] | SE | 15.12.2004 | |
DE | 16.12.2004 | ||
Former [2005/10] | SE | 15.12.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [PA]EP0680013 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [PA] 1,19,33,41 * column 2, line 30 - column 3, line 8; figure 1 *; | [D]US5734874 (VAN HOOK TIMOTHY J [US], et al); | [A]US5258826 (WAKELAND CARL K [US], et al) [A] 1,19,33,41 * column 2, line 27 - line 58; figure 2 * * column 19, line 27 - column 20, line 16; figure 20 * |