EP0732369 - Compositions of poly(phenylene ether), poly(arylene sulfide) polyester resins, and a compatibilizer compound [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.08.2001 [2001/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, Sterling B. 2308 Berkley Avenue Schenectady, New York 12309 / US | 02 /
Dai, Kevin H. 3 Carlton Oaks Clifton Park, New York 12065 / US | 03 /
Hwang, Chorng-Fure R. 100 North Tamilynn Circle Cary, North Carolina 27513 / US | 04 /
Rice, Steven T. 5 Arden Road Scotia, New York 12302 / US | 05 /
Scobbo Jr., James J. 209 Walnut Lane Slingerlands, New York 12159 / US | 06 /
Yates, John B. 85 Columbine Drive Glenmont, New York 12077 / US | [1996/38] | Representative(s) | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/38] | Szary, Anne Catherine, et al London Patent Operation, GE Technical Services Co. Inc., Essex House, 12-13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96301461.8 | 05.03.1996 | [1996/38] | Priority number, date | US19950405635 | 17.03.1995 Original published format: US 405635 | [1996/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0732369 | Date: | 18.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0732369 | Date: | 29.01.1997 | [1997/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0732369 | Date: | 16.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/33] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.1996 | Classification | IPC: | C08L71/12, C08L81/02, C08L67/02 | [1996/38] | CPC: |
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
C08L71/12 (EP,US);
C08L81/02 (EP,US);
H01B3/301 (EP,US);
H01B3/427 (EP,US);
H01B3/46 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08L2666/02 (EP,US);
C08L67/02, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L71/12, C08L2666/14 (US,EP);
C08L81/02, C08L2666/18 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/38] | Title | German: | Harzzusammensetzungen aus Polyphenylenether, Polyarylensulfid, Polyester und Verträglichkeitsmacher | [1999/42] | English: | Compositions of poly(phenylene ether), poly(arylene sulfide) polyester resins, and a compatibilizer compound | [1996/38] | French: | Compositions de résines à partir de polyéther de phénylène, polysulfure d'arylène, polyester et un agent de compatibilité | [1999/42] |
Former [1996/38] | Harzzusammensetzungen aus Polyphenylenether, Polyarylensulfide, Polyester und Verträglichkeitsmacher | ||
Former [1996/38] | Compositions de résine à partir de polyéther de phénylène, polysulfure d'arylène, polyester et un agent de compatibilité | Examination procedure | 29.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/39] | 04.05.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.1999 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.09.1999 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.09.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 22.11.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 09.12.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH04132766 ; | [X]EP0472960 (MITSUBISHI PETROCHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,3,15-17 * page 7, line 10 - line 14; claims 1-3 *; | [X]EP0570972 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,3,15-17 * page 7, line 49; claims 1-5 *; | [X]EP0568039 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]) [X] 1,3,15-17 * page 7, column 46; claims 1-4 *; | [A]JPH04318067 | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 25, Database accession no. 92-203854, XP002016078 & JPH04132766 A 19920507 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEM KK) [X] 1,3,15-17 * abstract * | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 92, no. 51, Database accession no. 92-421140, XP002016079 & JPH04318067 A 19921109 (TORAY IND INC) [A] 1-17 * abstract * |