EP0734180 - Subtitle encoding/decoding [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.03.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.05.2004 [2004/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2002/42] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 141 / JP | ||
Former [1996/39] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tsukagoshi, Ikuo, c/o Sony Corporation 6-7-35 Kitashinagawa Shinagawa-ku, Tokyo 141 / JP | [1996/39] | Representative(s) | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/39] | Cotter, Ivan John, et al D. YOUNG & CO. 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96301877.5 | 19.03.1996 | [1996/39] | Priority number, date | JP19950085956 | 20.03.1995 Original published format: JP 8595695 | JP19950295990 | 20.10.1995 Original published format: JP 29599095 | [1996/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0734180 | Date: | 25.09.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0734180 | Date: | 13.01.1999 | [1999/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0734180 | Date: | 14.05.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.12.1998 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/52 | [1996/39] | CPC: |
H04N7/0122 (EP,US);
G11B20/10 (KR);
G11B27/031 (EP,US);
G11B27/3063 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/23614 (EP,US);
H04N21/4348 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (EP,US);
H04N21/4884 (EP,US);
H04N21/8126 (EP,US);
H04N5/278 (EP,US);
H04N5/445 (KR);
H04N5/76 (KR);
H04N7/08 (KR);
H04N7/0885 (EP,US);
H04N9/8244 (EP,US);
G11B20/10527 (EP,US);
G11B2220/2545 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N5/783 (EP,US);
H04N9/8042 (EP,US);
H04N9/8063 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1996/39] | Title | German: | Kodierung/Dekodierung von Untertiteln | [1996/39] | English: | Subtitle encoding/decoding | [1996/39] | French: | Codage/décodage de sous-titres | [1996/39] | Examination procedure | 16.06.1999 | Examination requested [1999/32] | 30.01.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02079715.5 / EP1301043 | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9430014 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1,11,17,27,33* page 40, line 20 - page 48, line 10 *; | [X]WO9501704 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [X] 11,14,27,30; | [A]WO9502301 (ZENITH ELECTRONICS CORP [US]) [A] 1,11,17,27,33 * the whole document *; | [PXA]EP0662770 (SONY CORP [JP]) [PX] 11,14,27,30 * page 4, line 26 - page 31, line 12 * * page 6, line 3 - line 8; figure 1 * * page 10, line 49 - page 11, line 52; figure 16 * [PA] 1-10,12,13,15-26,28,29,31-41 |