EP0770489 - Ink containment system for an ink-jet pen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.03.2000 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.03.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2000 [2000/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kawamura, Naoto 136 NW 30th Street Corvallis, Oregon 97330 / US | 02 /
Weber, Timothy L. 2900 NE Pilkington Corvallis, Oregon 97330 / US | [1997/18] | Representative(s) | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1997/18] | Colgan, Stephen James, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96302191.0 | 28.03.1996 | [1997/18] | Priority number, date | US19950548568 | 26.10.1995 Original published format: US 548568 | [1997/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0770489 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0770489 | Date: | 26.05.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.1997 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/175 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
B41J2/17513 (EP,US);
B41J2/17526 (EP,US);
B41J2/17553 (EP,US);
B41J2/17556 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/18] | Title | German: | Tintenzurückhaltungsvorrichtung für Tintenstrahlschreiber | [1997/18] | English: | Ink containment system for an ink-jet pen | [1997/18] | French: | Dispositif pour la rétention de l'encre dans une imprimante par jet d'encre | [1997/18] | Examination procedure | 04.07.1997 | Examination requested [1997/36] | 07.08.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.02.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.06.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 01.10.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.01.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 04.01.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.02.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0624475 (CANON KK [JP]) [A] 1,6,7,10 * page 15, line 20 - line 40; figure 8 *; | [A]US4771295 (BAKER JEFFREY P [US], et al) [A] 1,8,10 * column W * |