EP0735092 - Mold material with additives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2004 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Vision Care, Inc. 7500 Centurion Parkway, Suite 100 Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | [2003/28] |
Former [1996/40] | For all designated states JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION PRODUCTS, INC. 4500 Salisbury Road Jacksonville, Florida 32216-0995 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kindt-Larsen, Ture Sollerodvej 40 2840 Holte / DK | 02 /
Longo, Jeffrey 209 Aquarius Circle North Jacksonville, Florida 32216 / US | 03 /
O'Brien, Keith 7575 Hollyridge Road Jacksonville, Florida 32256 / US | [1996/40] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/40] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 96302224.9 | 29.03.1996 | [1996/40] | Priority number, date | US19950414999 | 31.03.1995 Original published format: US 414999 | [1996/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0735092 | Date: | 02.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/40] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0735092 | Date: | 15.10.1997 | [1997/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0735092 | Date: | 03.09.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | C08L25/04, C08L23/12, C08K5/00, B29C33/40, B29D11/00, // B29K25:00, B29K23:00, B29L11:00 | [1996/40] | CPC data not yet available | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/40] | Extension states | SI | 15.04.1996 | Title | German: | Giessform mit Zuschlagstoffen | [1996/40] | English: | Mold material with additives | [1996/40] | French: | Moule avec des additifs | [1996/40] | Examination procedure | 20.03.1998 | Examination requested [1998/21] | 21.01.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.09.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.1999 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 23.07.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 15.01.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.03.2004 | FI | 29.03.2004 | PT | 29.03.2004 | ES | 30.03.2004 | SE | 30.03.2004 | BE | 31.03.2004 | CH | 31.03.2004 | DK | 31.03.2004 | LI | 31.03.2004 | [2008/29] |
Former [2006/12] | AT | 29.03.2004 | |
FI | 29.03.2004 | ||
ES | 30.03.2004 | ||
SE | 30.03.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/51] | AT | 29.03.2004 | |
FI | 29.03.2004 | ||
SE | 30.03.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 29.03.2004 | |
SE | 30.03.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
DK | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/21] | FI | 29.03.2004 | |
SE | 30.03.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
CH | 31.03.2004 | ||
LI | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | FI | 29.03.2004 | |
SE | 30.03.2004 | ||
BE | 31.03.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 29.03.2004 | |
SE | 30.03.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | SE | 30.03.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH06155489 ; | [A]JPH01315444 ; | [A]JPS6232010 ; | [A]US3422168 (BOWSER GEORGE H) [A] 1,7-9* column 9 - column 10 *; | [X]US4159292 (NEEFE CHARLES W [US]) [X] 1,3,6-9 * column 1, line 50 - line 55 * * column 2, line 48 - line 50 *; | [A]WO9209421 (BAUSCH & LOMB [US]) [A] 1,7-9; | [X]EP0560011 (HUELS CHEMISCHE WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,3 * page 3, line 56 - page 4, line 5 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940905), vol. 018, no. 474, Database accession no. (M - 1668), & JP06155489 A 19940603 (NIKON CORP) [A] 1,7-9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900305), vol. 014, no. 115, Database accession no. (C - 0696), & JP01315444 A 19891220 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEM CO INC) [A] 1,7-9 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870711), vol. 011, no. 215, Database accession no. (M - 606), & JP62032010 A 19870212 (TORAY IND INC) [A] 1,7-9 * abstract * |