EP0739146 - Telecommunications switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 18.03.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.05.2009 | Change - representative | published on 24.06.2009 [2009/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, QC H4S 2A9 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [2003/41] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited 2351 Boulevard Alfred-Nobel St. Laurent, Quebec H4S 2A9 / CA | ||
Former [2000/39] | For all designated states Nortel Networks Limited World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West, 8th floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | ||
Former [1999/28] | For all designated states NORTEL NETWORKS CORPORATION World Trade Center of Montreal 380 St. Antoine Street West 8th Floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | ||
Former [1996/43] | For all designated states NORTHERN TELECOM LIMITED World Trade Center of Montreal, 380 St. Antoine Street West 8th Floor Montreal, Quebec H2Y 3Y4 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Parker, James Wilson 35 Magna Ville Road Bishop's Stortford, Herts CM23 4DN / GB | 02 /
Munter, Ernst August 4 Nanook Crescent Kanata, Ontario K2L 2A7 / CA | [1996/43] | Representative(s) | Anderson, Angela Mary, et al Nortel Networks IP Law Group Harlow Laboratories London Road, Harlow Essex CM17 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Anderson, Angela Mary, et al Nortel Networks IP Law Group Harlow Laboratories London Road Harlow Essex CM17 9NA / GB | ||
Former [2003/13] | Anderson, Angela, et al Nortel Networks Limited, Harlow Laboratories, London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | ||
Former [2001/12] | Bewley, Ewan Stuart, et al Nortel Networks, IP Law Group, London Road Harlow, Essex CM17 9NA / GB | ||
Former [1996/43] | Laurence, Simon French Nortel Limited Patents and Licensing West Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2SH / GB | Application number, filing date | 96302294.2 | 01.04.1996 | [1996/43] | Priority number, date | GB19950007980 | 19.04.1995 Original published format: GB 9507980 | [1996/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0739146 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0739146 | Date: | 29.03.2000 | [2000/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q3/68, H04Q11/00 | [2000/13] | CPC: |
H04Q3/68 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/43] | H04Q3/68 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, SE [1996/43] | Title | German: | Fernmeldevermittlungssystem | [1996/43] | English: | Telecommunications switch | [1996/43] | French: | Commutateur de télécommunication | [1996/43] | Examination procedure | 29.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 11.03.2005 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2005/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5303078 (BRACKETT CHARLES A [US], et al) [Y] 5,7,9 * column 5, line 50 - line 68; figure 1 * * column 19, line 22 - line 51 *; | [XAY] - GIDRON R ET AL, "A USER TUNABLE ACCESS LIGHTWAVE NETWORK", JOURNAL OF LIGHTWAVE TECHNOLOGY,US,IEEE. NEW YORK, (19930501), vol. 11, no. 5/06, ISSN 0733-8724, pages 971 - 978, XP000396726 [X] 1-4 * page 971, column L, line 17 - line 31 * * page 971, column R, line 9 - line 12 * * page 971, column R, line 29 - line 38 * * page 974, column L, line 19 - column R, line 42 * * figures 1,3,4 * [A] 6,8,10 [Y] 5,7,9 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/50.233261 | [A] - AURA GANZ ET AL, "BROADCAST-WAVELENGTH ARCHITECTURES FOR A WDM PASSIVE STAR-BASED LOCAL AREA NETWORK", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, (1992), vol. -, ISBN 0-7803-0599-X, pages 837 - 842, XP000326794 [A] 1-10 * figure 3 * | [A] - ACAMPORA A S ET AL, "TERABIT LIGHTWAVE NETWORKS: THE MULTIHOP APPROACH", AT & T TECHNICAL JOURNAL,US,AMERICAN TELEPHONE AND TELEGRAPH CO. NEW YORK, (198711), vol. 66, no. 6, ISSN 8756-2324, pages 21 - 34, XP000812483 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |