EP0738872 - Stereo matching method and disparity measuring method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.10.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | [2008/47] |
Former [2002/45] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi, Osaka / JP | ||
Former [1996/43] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Onda, Katsumasa 1114-B207, Kami Sugeta-cho, Hodogaya-ku Yokohama / JP | [1996/43] | Representative(s) | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/43] | Dempster, Benjamin John Naftel, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings, Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 96302562.2 | 11.04.1996 | [1996/43] | Priority number, date | JP19950097204 | 21.04.1995 Original published format: JP 9720495 | [1996/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0738872 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0738872 | Date: | 14.07.1999 | [1999/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0738872 | Date: | 06.11.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01C11/06, G06T7/00 | [1996/43] | CPC: |
G01C11/06 (EP,US);
G06T7/593 (EP,US);
G06T7/74 (EP,US);
G06T7/77 (EP,US);
G06V10/10 (EP,US);
G06V10/24 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10012 (EP,US);
G06V2201/12 (EP,US);
H04N13/239 (EP,US);
H04N2013/0081 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/43] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Stereoübereinstimmungs- und Ungleichheitsmessung | [1996/43] | English: | Stereo matching method and disparity measuring method | [1996/43] | French: | Méthode de concordance et de mesure de disparité stéréo | [2002/04] |
Former [1996/43] | Méthode concordance et mesure de disparité stéréo | Examination procedure | 29.04.1996 | Examination requested [1996/43] | 06.07.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.05.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPS60217472 ; | [A]EP0373614 (SCHLUMBERGER TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1,9* abstract *; | [XP]EP0686942 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [XP] 9,10 * claims 1-12 *; | [Y] - NASRABADI N M, "A STEREO VISION TECHNIQUE USING CURVE-SEGMENTS AND RELAXATION MATCHING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON PATTERN ANALYSIS AND MACHINE INTELLIGENCE, (19920501), vol. 14, no. 5, pages 566 - 572, XP000271615 [Y] 1 * page 566, column R, line 24 - line 27 * * page 571, column L, line 14 - line 22 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/34.134060 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860329), vol. 10, no. 80, Database accession no. (P - 441), & JP60217472 A 00000000 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [Y] 1,9,10 * abstract * | [Y] - MCLAUCHLAN P F ET AL, "Stereoscopic recovery and description of smooth textured surfaces", IMAGE AND VISION COMPUTING, FEB. 1991, UK, ISSN 0262-8856, vol. 9, no. 1, pages 20 - 26, XP002103165 [Y] 9,10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0262-8856(91)90044-P |