EP0738630 - Adjustable deployment door for airbag module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.11.1997 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.11.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.01.1998 [1998/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC. 100 North Riverside Plaza, Randolph Street at the River Chicago Illinois 60606 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/43] | For all designated states MORTON INTERNATIONAL, INC. 100 North Riverside Plaza, Randolph Street at the River Chicago, Illinois 60606 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, John G. 1042 Falcon Drive Troy, Michigan 48098 / US | 02 /
Repp, James H. 539 Bentley Drive Monroe, Michigan 48161 / US | 03 /
Steimke, Daniel L. 2772 Foothill Drive Ogden, Utah 84409 / US | [1996/44] |
Former [1996/43] | 01 /
Bauer, John G. 539 Bentley Drive Monroe, Michigan 48161 / US | ||
02 /
Repp, James H. 1042 Falcon Drive Troy, Michigan 48098 / US | |||
03 /
Steimke, Daniel L. 2772 Foothill Drive Ogden, Utah 84409 / US | Representative(s) | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al Baron Warren Redfern Cambridge House 100 Cambridge Grove Hammersmith, London W6 0LE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/43] | Warren, Keith Stanley, et al BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington London W8 5BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 96302763.6 | 19.04.1996 | [1996/43] | Priority number, date | US19950426071 | 20.04.1995 Original published format: US 426071 | [1996/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0738630 | Date: | 23.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.1996 | Classification | IPC: | B60R21/20 | [1996/43] | CPC: |
B60R21/2171 (EP,US);
B60R2021/2172 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/43] | Title | German: | Verstellbarer Entfaltungsdeckel für ein Luftsackmodul | [1996/43] | English: | Adjustable deployment door for airbag module | [1996/43] | French: | Couvercle de déploiement réglable pour module de sac gonflable | [1996/43] | File destroyed: | 13.09.2003 | Examination procedure | 24.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1998/02] | 13.08.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1998/02] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2696392 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1-3,9,10,17* the whole document *; | [A]US5407224 (BAUER JOHN G [US], et al) [A] 1,9,17 * column W *; | [PY]US5456488 (BAUER JOHN G [US]) [PY] 1-4,8-11,17,18 * column W *; | [Y] - "Improved Air Bag Component Retention Method", RESEARCH DISCLOSURE, EMSWORTH, GB, (199407), no. 363, page 368, XP000461314 [Y] 1-4,8-11,17,18 * the whole document * |