EP0740052 - Method and apparatus for implementing a thermodynamic cycle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.01.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.06.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.07.2008 [2008/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exergy, Inc. 22320 Foothill Boulevard, Suite 540 Hayward California 94541 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | For all designated states Exergy, Inc. 22320 Foothill Boulevard, Suite 540 Hayward, California 94541 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kalina, Alexander I. 105 Glen Garry Way Hillsborough, California 94010 / US | 02 /
Pelletier, Richard I. 2288 Miramar Avenue No. 22C San Leandro, California 94578 / US | [1996/44] | Representative(s) | Ruffles, Graham Keith Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/44] | Ruffles, Graham Keith MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 96302844.4 | 23.04.1996 | [1996/44] | Priority number, date | US19950429706 | 27.04.1995 Original published format: US 429706 | [1996/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0740052 | Date: | 30.10.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0740052 | Date: | 01.10.1997 | [1997/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0740052 | Date: | 06.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.1997 | Classification | IPC: | F01K25/06 | [1996/44] | CPC: |
F01K25/065 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, PT, SE [1996/44] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für die Durchführung eines thermodynamischen Zyklus | [1996/44] | English: | Method and apparatus for implementing a thermodynamic cycle | [1996/44] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la mise en oeuvre d'un cycle thermodynamique | [1996/44] | Examination procedure | 17.03.1997 | Examination requested [1997/20] | 10.04.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 09.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 23.04.2002 | PT | 23.04.2002 | ES | 24.04.2002 | GB | 06.06.2002 | [2008/29] |
Former [2004/28] | AT | 23.04.2002 | |
ES | 24.04.2002 | ||
GB | 06.06.2002 | ||
Former [2004/21] | AT | 23.04.2002 | |
GB | 06.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/47] | AT | 23.04.2002 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4732005 (KALINA ALEXANDER I [US]) [AD] 1* abstract *; | [AD]US4899545 (KALINA ALEXANDER I [US]) [AD] 1 * abstract *; | [X] - ZERVOS N G, UPDATED DESIGN AND ECONOMICS OF THE KALINA CYCLE FOR SOLID FUEL APPLICATIONS, PROCEEDINGS OF THE AMERICAN POWER CONFERENCE, VOL. 1, PAGE(S) 179 - 184, (1993), XP000609705 [X] 1,16,23,38 * page 180, column R, line 1 - page 181, column L, paragraph 1; figure 1 * |