EP0745859 - Configurable probe pads to facilitate parallel testing of integrated circuit devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2005 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.01.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.02.2008 [2008/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton Texas 75006-5039 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/08] | For all designated states STMicroelectronics, Inc. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton Texas 75006-5039 / US | ||
Former [1996/49] | For all designated states SGS-THOMSON MICROELECTRONICS, INC. 1310 Electronics Drive Carrollton Texas 75006-5039 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brannigan, Michael Joseph 941 Southwood Drive Highland Village, Texas 75067 / US | 02 /
Lysinger, Mark Alan 3118 Regency Carrollton, Texas 75007 / US | 03 /
McClure, David Charles 3701 Elizabeth Drive Carrollton, Texas 75007 / US | [1996/49] | Representative(s) | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2004/35] | Driver, Virginia Rozanne, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | ||
Former [1996/49] | Palmer, Roger, et al PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 96302949.1 | 26.04.1996 | [1996/49] | Priority number, date | US19950456181 | 31.05.1995 Original published format: US 456181 | [1996/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0745859 | Date: | 04.12.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/49] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0745859 | Date: | 06.08.1997 | [1997/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0745859 | Date: | 27.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.1997 | Classification | IPC: | G01R1/04, G01R31/316 | [1997/32] | CPC: |
G01R31/2884 (EP,US);
G01R31/2831 (EP,US);
G11C29/48 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/49] | G01R1/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1996/49] | Title | German: | Konfigurierbare Kontaktleiste zur bequemen parallellen Prüfung von integrierten Schaltungen | [1996/49] | English: | Configurable probe pads to facilitate parallel testing of integrated circuit devices | [1996/49] | French: | Contacts configurables pour faciliter le test parallèle de circuits intégrés | [1996/49] | Examination procedure | 07.01.1998 | Examination requested [1998/11] | 28.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.12.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.04.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 27.10.2004 | [2008/06] | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - "MULTICHIP MODULE/ENGINEERING CHANGE SCHEME USING PROGRAMMABLE PROBE PADS", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, (19911001), vol. 34, no. 5, pages 388 - 390, XP000189800 [A] 1 * page 389, paragraph 1 - page 389; figure 2 * |