EP0741339 - Modular charging device for imaging system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/08] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester, New York 14644 / US | ||
Former [1996/45] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kleckner, Robert J. 2219 Mark Road Westchester, Yorktown Heights, NY 10598 / US | 02 /
Makarchuk, Irena 60 Cambridge Street Fairfield, Connecticut 06430 / US | 03 /
Martines, Frank 50 Virginia Avenue Suffolk, Lake Ronkonkoma, NY 11779 / US | [1996/45] | Representative(s) | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/52] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2007/07] | Skone James, Robert Edmund, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2007/04] | Finnie, Peter John, et al Gill Jennings & Every Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1998/32] | Rackham, Stephen Neil, et al GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [1996/45] | Reynolds, Julian David, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 96303159.6 | 03.05.1996 | [1996/45] | Priority number, date | US19950434962 | 04.05.1995 Original published format: US 434962 | [1996/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0741339 | Date: | 06.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/45] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0741339 | Date: | 17.06.1998 | [1998/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0741339 | Date: | 20.02.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/08] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.1998 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/02, H01T19/00 | [1998/24] | CPC: |
H01T19/00 (EP,US);
G03G15/0291 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1996/45] | G03G15/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1996/45] | Title | German: | Modulare Aufladevorrichtung für ein Bilderzeugungsgerät | [2001/12] | English: | Modular charging device for imaging system | [1996/45] | French: | Dispositif de chargement modulaire pour un système de formation d'images | [1996/45] |
Former [1996/45] | Modular Aufladevorrichtung für ein Bilderzeugungsgerät | Examination procedure | 17.12.1998 | Examination requested [1999/08] | 27.06.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2000 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.04.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.08.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 26.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
15.11.2002
25.11.2001
ADMISSIBLE Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US Opponent's representative Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/35] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.11.2002
25.11.2001
ADMISSIBLE Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester NY 14650-2201 / US Opponent's representative Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Industrie Département Brevets et Licences CRT 60/2 Zone Industrielle F-71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/45] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.11.2002
25.11.2001
ADMISSIBLE NexPress Solutions, Inc. 2600 Manitou Road Rochester, New York 14624 / US Opponent's representative Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Industrie Département Brevets et Licences CRT 60/2 Zone Industrielle F-71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2005/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.11.2002
25.11.2001
ADMISSIBLE NexPress Solutions, Inc. 2600 Manitou Road Rochester, New York 14624 / US Opponent's representative Lauerwald, Jörg, et al, et al NexPress GmbH Postfach 24 60 24023 Kiel / DE | ||
Former [2003/02] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
15.11.2002
25.11.2001
ADMISSIBLE NexPress Solutions LLC 1447 St. Paul Street Rochester, NY 14653-7001 / US Opponent's representative Lauerwald, Jörg, et al, et al Heidelberger Druckmaschinen AG TPT-R4 Dr.-Hell-Strasse 24107 Kiel / DE | 02.01.2003 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.05.2003 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.05.2004 | Date of oral proceedings | 18.06.2004 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.06.2004 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 25.09.2007 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2008/13] | Appeal following opposition | 12.08.2004 | Appeal received No. T1279/04 | 22.10.2004 | Statement of grounds filed | 25.09.2007 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 25.09.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.10.2007 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.05.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4695723 (MINOR JAMES C [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7 * column W * [Y] 4,5; | [Y]JPS57189155 ; | [Y]US4387980 (UENO TSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * column 3, line 25 - line 43; figures 2,4 *; | [A]US3743830 (TAKAHASHI I, et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US4358681 (ANDO YUJIRO) [A] 1-8 * column 5, line 32 - column 6, line 49; figure -; claim - * | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19830210), vol. 007, no. 035, Database accession no. (P - 175), & JP57189155 A 19821120 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI KK) [Y] 4 * abstract * |